Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016193043 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113252217 | 04.10.2011 | KR20090080708 | 28.08.2009 | US23982809 | 04.09.2009 | US63180309 | 04.12.2009 | US201514709024 | 11.05.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8632588 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2014 | B2 | US2012179246 | 12.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20110080392 | 12.08.2011 | US201213425270 | 20.03.2012 | US63180309 | 04.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8231671 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2012 | B2 | US2011054597 | 03.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20090080708 | 28.08.2009 | US23982809 | 04.09.2009 | US63180309 | 04.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10940006 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2021 | B2 | US2019262128 | 29.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113252217 | 04.10.2011 | US201816226627 | 19.12.2018 | KR20090080708 | 28.08.2009 | US23982809 | 04.09.2009 | US63180309 | 04.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10874515 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2020 | B2 | US2019269503 | 05.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113252217 | 04.10.2011 | KR20090080708 | 28.08.2009 | US201816226630 | 19.12.2018 | US23982809 | 04.09.2009 | US63180309 | 04.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10195032 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2019 | B2 | US2012029629 | 02.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113252217 | 04.10.2011 | KR20090080708 | 28.08.2009 | US23982809 | 04.09.2009 | US63180309 | 04.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101116867B | Global Dossier | 06.03.2012 | B1 | KR20110023094 | 08.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20090080708 | 28.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014525809 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20110080392 | 12.08.2011 | WO2012KR06237 | 06.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103930068 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20110080392 | 12.08.2011 | WO2012KR06237 | 06.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2742912 | Global Dossier | 13.05.2015 | A4 | EP2742912 | 18.06.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20110080392 | 12.08.2011 | WO2012KR06237 | 06.08.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013024998 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2013 | A3 | WO2013024998 | 21.02.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20110080392 | 12.08.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101231140B | Global Dossier | 07.02.2013 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR20110080392 | 12.08.2011 |