EP2742912 - DEVICE FOR MITRAL VALVE MEMBRANE CERCLAGE PROCEDURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pusan National University Industry-University Cooperation Foundation 2, Busandaehak-ro 63 beon-gil Geumjeong-gu Busan 609-735 / KR | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, June-Hong 312-1102, 100, Gwanganhaebyeon-ro Suyeong-gu Busan 613-010 / KR | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Ferreccio, Rinaldo Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Ferreccio, Rinaldo Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 12823906.8 | 06.08.2012 | WO2012KR06237 | Priority number, date | KR20110080392 | 12.08.2011 Original published format: KR 20110080392 | [2014/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013024998 | Date: | 21.02.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2742912 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24, A61B17/00, A61M25/01, A61F2/06, // A61B17/04 | [2015/20] | CPC: |
A61B17/00 (KR);
A61F2/06 (KR);
A61F2/2451 (EP,KR);
A61F2/2466 (EP,KR);
A61M25/01 (KR);
A61B2017/00783 (EP,KR);
A61B2017/0496 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/25] | A61F2/24, A61B17/00, A61M25/01, A61F2/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN EINGRIFF MIT EINEM UMSCHLINGUNGSDRAHT UM DIE MITRALKLAPPENMEMBRAN | [2014/25] | English: | DEVICE FOR MITRAL VALVE MEMBRANE CERCLAGE PROCEDURE | [2014/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR PROCÉDURE DE CERCLAGE D'UNE MEMBRANE DE VALVE MITRALE | [2014/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2014 | Translation filed | 11.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 17.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 23.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006105008 (AMPLE MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [I] 1-4,7 * page 39, line 33 - page 42, line 9; figures 16, 20, 27, 47, 55-56, 72-73 * * page 45, lines 12-26 * * page 52, lines 4-21 * * page 55, line 25 - page 60, line 19 * * page 66, line 21 - page 70, line 20 *; | [A]US2011009957 (LANGBERG JONATHAN J [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4,7 * paragraphs [0064] - [0067] - [ 079] - [0081]; figures 5-9 *; | [A]US2011054597 (KIM JUNE-HONG [KR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20110023094 (KIM JUNE HONG [KR]); | [A]JP2009505789 (STEVEN WEISS); | [A]KR100824753B (SYNTHES GMBH) | by applicant | WO2008060553 | KR20090080708 |