EP2745034 - VALVE POSITION TRANSLATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cameron International Corporation 1333 West Loop South, Suite 1700 Houston, TX 77027 / US | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASE, William T. 21420 Hwy 365 South Little Rock, Arkansas 72206 / US | 02 /
WOLF, Robert H. 34 Summerfield Drive Conway, Arkansas 72034 / US | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Akers, Noel James N.J. Akers & Co 63 Lemon Street Truro, Cornwall TR1 2PN / GB | [2014/26] | Application number, filing date | 12823922.5 | 14.08.2012 | [2016/23] | WO2012US50778 | Priority number, date | US201113212687 | 18.08.2011 Original published format: US201113212687 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013025706 | Date: | 21.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2745034 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2745034 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16K37/00, F16K31/524 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
F16K5/163 (EP,US);
F16K37/0083 (CN);
F16K31/5284 (US);
F16K31/44 (US);
F16K31/524 (CN);
F16K31/54 (US);
F16K31/60 (US);
F16K37/0008 (EP,US);
F16K37/0041 (EP,US);
F16K5/00 (US);
F16K37/0058 (US);
F16K5/187 (US);
Y10T137/8225 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8242 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8259 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8275 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTILSTELLUNGSÜBERSETZER | [2014/26] | English: | VALVE POSITION TRANSLATOR | [2014/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSLATION DE POSITION DE SOUPAPE | [2014/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 27.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16164868.8 / EP3067605 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.08.2012 | AL | 08.06.2016 | AT | 08.06.2016 | BE | 08.06.2016 | BG | 08.06.2016 | CY | 08.06.2016 | CZ | 08.06.2016 | DK | 08.06.2016 | EE | 08.06.2016 | ES | 08.06.2016 | FI | 08.06.2016 | HR | 08.06.2016 | LT | 08.06.2016 | LV | 08.06.2016 | MC | 08.06.2016 | MK | 08.06.2016 | NL | 08.06.2016 | PL | 08.06.2016 | RO | 08.06.2016 | RS | 08.06.2016 | SE | 08.06.2016 | SI | 08.06.2016 | SK | 08.06.2016 | SM | 08.06.2016 | TR | 08.06.2016 | IE | 14.08.2016 | LU | 14.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | GB | 08.09.2016 | NO | 08.09.2016 | GR | 09.09.2016 | IS | 08.10.2016 | PT | 10.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 14.08.2012 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
TR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IE | 14.08.2016 | ||
LU | 14.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
GB | 08.09.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 14.08.2012 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
IE | 14.08.2016 | ||
LU | 14.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
GB | 08.09.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 14.08.2012 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
IE | 14.08.2016 | ||
LU | 14.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
GB | 08.09.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.08.2012 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
IE | 14.08.2016 | ||
LU | 14.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
GB | 08.09.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
IE | 14.08.2016 | ||
LU | 14.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
GB | 08.09.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 08.06.2016 | |
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 08.06.2016 | |
NO | 08.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2833510 (HERBERT ALLEN, et al) [A] 1-10* column 5, line 18 - line 55; figure - *; | [A]US4195816 (HUBBERT MURRAY J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure - * | International search | [X]US4195816 (HUBBERT MURRAY J [US], et al); | [A]US4235258 (HEIR HIROYOSHI UNO [JP], et al); | [A]US4666124 (GIACOBBI PETER D [US]) |