EP2744346 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING FUNGAL FOLIAR PATHOGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leahy Jr., James 864 Route 202 Franklin Centre, Quebec J0S 1E0 / CA | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Downing, Michael Philip Downing IP Limited Grosvenor House 7 Horseshoe Crescent Beaconsfield, Bucks. HP9 1LJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Downing, Michael Philip Downing Intellectual Property LLP Oak House Oak End Way Gerrards Cross Buckinghamshire SL9 8BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 12824352.4 | 14.08.2012 | WO2012CA00846 | Priority number, date | CA20112748993 | 15.08.2011 Original published format: CA 2748993 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013023286 | Date: | 21.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2744346 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 21.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01N65/40, A01N37/40, A01N59/02, A01P3/00 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
A01N59/02 (EP);
A01N65/40 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/02, A01N37/40, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N65/40, A01N37/40, A01N59/02, A01N2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON MYKOTISCHEN BLATTPATHOGENEN | [2014/26] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING FUNGAL FOLIAR PATHOGENS | [2014/26] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE LUTTE CONTRE LES PATHOGÈNES FOLIAIRES FONGIQUES | [2014/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 10.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 27.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/52] | 27.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO2007139382 (PRAKTIJKONDERZOEK PLANT & OMGE [NL], et al) [ID] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [XP]WO2012039846 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE LP [US], et al); | [X]WO2010088185 (AMCOL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US], et al); | [X]US7704518 (TAMARKIN DOV [IL], et al); | [X]CA2388484 (WOOD STEVE [CA]); | [Y]US7906131 (BROWER WILLIAM [US]); | [XE]US2012244233 (LEAHY JR JAMES [CA]) | [Y] - PERCIVAL, G. C., "Effect of systemic inducing resistance and biostimulant materials on apple scab using a detached leaf bioassay", ARBORICULTURE & URBAN FORESTRY, (201001), vol. 36, no. 1, pages 41 - 46, XP055144411 | [Y] - JAMAR, L., "Innovative strategies for the control of apple scab (Venturia inaequalis [Cke.] Wint.) in organic apple production", DOCTORAL THESIS, UNIVERSITÉ DE LIEGE - GEMBLOUX AGRO-BIO TECH, BELGIUM, (20110325), URL: http://orbi.ulg.ac.be/handle/2268/87016, XP055144416 |