EP2744801 - 5,6,7,8-TETRAHYDRO-6-[N,N-BIS[(2-THIENYL)ETHYL]]AMINO-1-NAPHTHOL, AND PREPARING METHOD AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shan Dong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No.9 Baoyuan Road Laishan District Yantai, Shandong 264003 / CN | [2017/07] |
Former [2014/26] | For all designated states Shan Dong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No.9 Baoyuan Road Laishan District Yantai, Shandong 264003 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Mina No. 19 Jianan Road Laishan District Yantai Shandong 264003 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Yanyan No. 585 Tongshi Road Zhifu District Yantai Shandong 264003 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Fengmei No. 50 Xinyuan Road Laishan District Yantai Shandong 264003 / CN | 04 /
MENG, Qingguo No. 30 Qingquan Road Laishan District Yantai Shandong 264005 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Tao No. 48-3 Wenhua Road Zhifu District Yantai Shandong 264000 / CN | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Keenway Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2014/26] | Bublak, Wolfgang Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12824605.5 | 06.08.2012 | [2017/07] | WO2012CN01038 | Priority number, date | CN201110235541 | 17.08.2011 Original published format: CN201110235541 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013023433 | Date: | 21.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2744801 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2744801 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/20, G01N30/02 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
C07D333/20 (EP,US);
C07D233/20 (RU);
A61P25/16 (EP);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
G01N30/02 (RU,US);
G01N2030/8877 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 5,6,7,8-TETRAHYDRO-[6-N, N-BIS [(2-THIENYL)] ETHYL]AMINO-1-NAPHTHOL, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG | [2014/26] | English: | 5,6,7,8-TETRAHYDRO-6-[N,N-BIS[(2-THIENYL)ETHYL]]AMINO-1-NAPHTHOL, AND PREPARING METHOD AND USE THEREOF | [2014/26] | French: | 5,6,7,8-TÉTRAHYDRO-6-[N,N-BIS[(2-THIÉNYL)ÉTHYL]]AMINO-1-NAPHTOL, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET UTILISATION | [2014/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 02.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.10.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.08.2012 | AL | 15.02.2017 | CY | 15.02.2017 | CZ | 15.02.2017 | DK | 15.02.2017 | EE | 15.02.2017 | FI | 15.02.2017 | HR | 15.02.2017 | LT | 15.02.2017 | LV | 15.02.2017 | MC | 15.02.2017 | MK | 15.02.2017 | RO | 15.02.2017 | RS | 15.02.2017 | SE | 15.02.2017 | SI | 15.02.2017 | SK | 15.02.2017 | SM | 15.02.2017 | TR | 15.02.2017 | BG | 15.05.2017 | NO | 15.05.2017 | GR | 16.05.2017 | IS | 15.06.2017 | PT | 15.06.2017 | IE | 06.08.2017 | LU | 06.08.2017 | MT | 06.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 06.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
TR | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
MT | 06.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 06.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
MT | 06.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
MT | 06.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
MT | 06.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 15.02.2017 | |
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
MT | 06.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 15.02.2017 | |
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 15.02.2017 | |
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | CZ | 15.02.2017 | |
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 15.02.2017 | |
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 15.02.2017 | |
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 15.02.2017 | |
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 15.02.2017 | |
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 15.02.2017 | |
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 15.02.2017 | |
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010073124 (ACTAVIS GROUP PTC EHF [IS], et al) [X] 8 * examples 7,10-14 * | International search | [A]US4564628 (HORN ALAN S [NL]) | [X] - T.K.GERDING ET AL., "Determination of enantiomeric purity of the new D-2 dopamine agonist 2-(N-propyl-N-2-thienylethylamino)-5-hydroxytetralin (N-0437) by reversed-phase high-performance liquid chromatography after pre-column derivatization with D(+)-glucuronic acid", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, BIOMEDICAL APPLICATIONS, (1989), vol. 487, no. 1, pages 125 - 134, XP027550755 |