EP2666191 - PHOTODETECTOR AND UPCONVERSION DEVICE WITH GAIN (EC) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Florida Research Foundation, Inc. 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville, FL 32611 / US | For all designated states Nanoholdings LLC 111 Rowayton Avenue Suite 2 Rowayton, CT 06853 / US | [2013/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SO, Franky 5014 N.W. 60th Terrace Gainesville, FL 32653 / US | 02 /
KIM, Do Young 5007 N.W. 69th Place Gainesville, FL 32653 / US | 03 /
PRADHAN, Bhabendra 360 Bloombridge Way Marietta, GA 30066 / US | [2014/21] |
Former [2013/48] | 01 /
SO, Franky 5014 N.W. 60th Terrace Gainesville, FL 32653 / US | ||
02 /
KIM, Do Young 5007 N.W. 69th Place Gainesville, FL 32653 / US | |||
03 /
PRAHDAN, Bhabendra 360 Bloombridge Way Marietta, GA 30066 / US | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/48] | Stevens, Ian Edward Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12825553.6 | 28.02.2012 | WO2012US26920 | Priority number, date | US201161447406P | 28.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161447406 P | [2013/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013028232 | Date: | 28.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2666191 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/101, H01L27/28 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
H01L31/02322 (EP,US);
H01L31/101 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K59/65 (US);
G02B23/12 (EP,US);
H01L31/028 (EP,US);
H01L31/0304 (EP,US);
H01L31/032 (EP,US);
H01L31/0324 (EP,US);
H01L31/035218 (EP,US);
H10K30/211 (US);
H10K59/60 (EP,US);
H10K65/00 (EP,US);
H10K2102/103 (EP,US);
H10K30/40 (US);
H10K39/30 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/48] | H01L31/101 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Title | German: | PHOTODETEKTOR UND AUFWÄRTSUMSETZUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT VERSTÄRKUNG (EC) | [2013/48] | English: | PHOTODETECTOR AND UPCONVERSION DEVICE WITH GAIN (EC) | [2013/48] | French: | PHOTODÉTECTEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION ASCENDANTE AVEC GAIN (EC) | [2013/48] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 20.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/04] | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004262614 (HACK MICHAEL [US], et al); | [X]US2010044676 (SARGENT EDWARD HARTLEY [CA], et al); | [X]US2011031403 (SO FRANKY [US]); | International search | [A]US2005110007 (FORREST STEPHEN R [US], et al); | [A]WO2007017475 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]US2010044676 (SARGENT EDWARD HARTLEY [CA], et al); | [A]US2010233842 (GREIN CHRISTOPHER H [US], et al) |