EP2748881 - BATTERY MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Innovation Co., Ltd. 99 Seorin-dong Jongno-gu Seoul 110-110 / KR | [2014/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jong Hwan 209-705 Saemmeori Apt. Dunsan 2-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-777 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Young Suk 207-813 Songgang Chungsol Apt. Songgang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-752 / KR | 03 /
HWANG, Chang Mook 120-808 Keunmaeul Apt. Galma 2-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-756 / KR | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Stolmár & Partner Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12826220.1 | 30.07.2012 | WO2012KR06048 | Priority number, date | KR20110084254 | 24.08.2011 Original published format: KR 20110084254 | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013027935 | Date: | 28.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2748881 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/36, H01M2/30, H01M2/02, H01M2/18, H01M2/38, H01M10/0585, // H01M10/04 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
H01M10/0585 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/60 (KR);
H01M10/049 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/058 (KR);
H01M50/105 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/463 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/682 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/70 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y02P70/50 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/27] | H01M2/36, H01M2/30, H01M2/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Title | German: | BATTERIEMODUL | [2014/27] | English: | BATTERY MODULE | [2014/27] | French: | MODULE DE BATTERIE | [2014/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 20.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3591422 (BERNHOLTZ HERBERT A, et al) [A] 4 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPS4835333 (-) [A] 5,7* figures 1,2 *; | [XI]JP2002117814 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [I] 4-7; | [XI]US2003162085 (SAUSEDA CYNTHIA CAROL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraphs [0002] , [0032] , [0037] * * figures 1,5 * [I] 4,5,7 | International search | [A]JP2005149916 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY); | [A]US2005191549 (KANG HEE G [KR], et al); | [X]KR20050120465 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20070021583 (LG CHEM. LTD.); | [Y]JP2008262738 (HITACHI MAXELL) |