EP2751796 - ADAPTIVE TRAINING SYSTEM, METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L-3 Communications Corporation 600 Third Avenue New York, NY 10016 / US | [2014/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALASH, Mark 21414 N. 133rd Avenue Sun City West, AZ 85375 / US | 02 /
POLLAK, Eytan 586 West Palm Valley Drive Oviedo, FL 32765 / US | 03 /
BARNOSKE, Michael 2724a Cheval Street No. 101 Orlando, FL 32828 / US | [2014/33] |
Former [2014/28] | 01 /
FALASH, Mark 5856 Pine Grove Run Oviedo, FL 32765 / US | ||
02 /
POLLAK, Eytan 586 West Palm Valley Drive Oviedo, FL 32765 / US | |||
03 /
BARNOSKE, Michael 2724a Cheval Street No. 101 Orlando, FL 32828 / US | Representative(s) | Staudt, Armin Walter Sandeldamm 24a 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | Staudt, Armin Walter Patentanwalt Sandeldamm 24a 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 12827058.4 | 04.09.2012 | WO2012US53700 | Priority number, date | US201161530348P | 01.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161530348 P | [2014/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013033723 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2751796 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G09B9/00, G09B9/02, G09B7/04, G09B7/00, // G09B5/06, G09B19/00 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
G09B7/00 (EP,US);
G09B5/06 (US);
G09B7/04 (EP,US);
G09B9/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/28] | G09B9/00, G09B5/06, G09B19/00, G06Q50/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Title | German: | ADAPTIVES TRAININGSSYSTEM SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2014/28] | English: | ADAPTIVE TRAINING SYSTEM, METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2014/28] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE FORMATION ADAPTATIFS | [2014/28] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 19.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/47] | 15.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.11.2018 | 30.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6053737 (BABBITT BETTINA A [US], et al) [I] 1-14* the whole document *; | [I]WO2010044982 (BOEING CO [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [IY] - Dr Painter ET AL, "General Aviation Pilot Advisory and Training System (GAPATS) Semiannual Technical Progress Report Contents", (19970916), pages 1 - 36, URL: http://ntrs.nasa.gov/archive/nasa/casi.ntrs.nasa.gov/19970034833.pdf, (20150305), XP055174341 [I] 1-4,6-10,12-14 * pages 2,4,6,10 * * pages 13-14,20 * [Y] 5,11 | [Y] - APRIL BROOMER, "CAE Simfinity(TM) Suite of training devices", INTERNET CITATION, (20100630), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.cae.com/en/military/_pdf/datasheet.simfinity.pdf, (20110314), XP002628085 [Y] 5,11 * the whole document * | International search | [A]EP0483991 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [X]KR20020030305 (K L C INTERNET EDUCATION BROAD [KR]); | [A]KR20020090751 (NEOEDU CO [KR]); | [A]US2006195412 (SLEMMER JOHN B [US], et al); | [A]WO2010083563 (HOGAN BRENDAN [AU]) |