EP2752936 - PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikura Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | For all designated states Fujikura Ltd. 5-1 Kiba 1-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOI Katsuhiro c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | [2014/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12827849.6 | 31.08.2012 | WO2012JP72111 | Priority number, date | JP20110190210 | 31.08.2011 Original published format: JP 2011190210 | JP20110190211 | 31.08.2011 Original published format: JP 2011190211 | [2014/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013031933 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2752936 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01M14/00, H01L31/04, H01G9/20 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
H01G9/2077 (EP,US);
H01G9/2031 (EP,US);
H01G9/2059 (EP,US);
Y02E10/542 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/28] | H01M14/00, H01L31/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Title | German: | PHOTOELEKTRISCHES UMWANDLUNGSELEMENT | [2014/28] | English: | PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION ELEMENT | [2014/28] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE | [2014/28] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2014 | Translation filed | 24.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 15.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/28] | 29.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2004119149 (HITACHI MAXELL) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0064]; figures 1-4; examples 1-3 * [Y] 4,5,7-12; | [XPY]EP2453455 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [XP] 1 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0066]; figures 1,3,6,7; claims 1-10 * [Y] 1-12; | [XY]WO2010014161 (CORNING INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0066]; figures 1,4,5 * [Y] 1-12; | [Y]WO2010098311 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0126]; figures 1-3 *; | [YP]EP2403052 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP]) [YP] 1-12 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0126]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [X]JP2004119149 (HITACHI MAXELL); | [X]JP2006004827 (HITACHI MAXELL); | [A]WO2010090145 (THREE BOND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2010050207 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2011013423 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2009098857 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007258121 (SEKISUI JUSHI KK); | [A]JP2010198821 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [AP]JP2012113946 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | JP2010040432 |