EP2751447 - CHAIN AND COUPLING LINKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esco Corporation 2141 NW 25th Avenue Portland, OR 97210-2578 / US | [2014/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRISCOE, Terry, L. 11399 NW Ridge Road Portland, OR 97229 / US | 02 /
CARPENTER, Christopher, M. 19047 SW Chesapeake Drive Tualatin, OR 97062 / US | 03 /
ROSE, Michael 509 E 16th Street Farmington, NM 87401 / US | 04 /
HIRTLE, Sean, T. 3809 Elgarose Road Roseburg, OR 97470 / US | 05 /
OLLINGER, Charles, G. 1924 SW 14th Avenue Portland, OR 97201 / US | [2014/28] | Representative(s) | Kirkpatrick Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | Application number, filing date | 12827880.1 | 29.08.2012 | WO2012US52791 | Priority number, date | US201161529223P | 30.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161529223 P | [2014/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013033157 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2751447 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16G13/06 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
F16G13/14 (EP,CN,US);
F16G13/18 (US);
B21L15/00 (US);
F16G15/02 (EP,CN,US);
F16G15/04 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Title | German: | KETTE UND VERBINDUNGSGLIEDER | [2014/28] | English: | CHAIN AND COUPLING LINKS | [2014/28] | French: | CHAÎNE ET MAILLONS D'ACCOUPLEMENT | [2014/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 24.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2621471 (RUSSELL DOCK MORTIMER) [X] 1-12 * column 3, line 73 - column 4, line 29; figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB2160252 (LJUSNE KATTING AB) [A] 1,4 * page 1, line 81 - page 2, line 23; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO9617186 (BRUPAT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,4 * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 8; figures 5,6 *; | [A]WO2007068472 (SCHMIEDESTUECK VERTRIEB FEUERS [DE], et al) [A] 1,4 * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 24; figures 1-3 * * page 8, line 6 - line 20 *; | [A]US2010037585 (MUELLE WILHELM [DE], et al) [A] 1,4* the whole document * | International search | [X]US2621471 (RUSSELL DOCK MORTIMER); | [A]US2761275 (KALLEEN ROBBINS WILLIAM); | [X]US2819586 (ST PIERRE HENRY); | [A]US2979886 (ROBBINS WILLIAM K); | [A]US5873232 (BRUCE PETER [GB]) |