EP2751366 - A GROOVE STRIP FOR MOUNTING OF A SHEET UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eriksson, Lars V.Sveagatan 50 361 31 Emmaboda / SE | [2014/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/28] | Representative(s) | Bjelkstam, Peter Radjursvägen 11 131 42 Nacka / SE | [2014/28] | Application number, filing date | 12827967.6 | 29.08.2012 | WO2012SE00125 | Priority number, date | SE20110000627 | 29.08.2011 Original published format: SE 1100627 | [2014/28] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013032384 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2751366 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/54, E06B5/11 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
E06B3/5409 (EP,SE);
E06B3/5828 (EP);
E06B5/116 (EP,SE)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Title | German: | RILLENSTREIFEN ZUR MONTAGE EINER BAHNENEINHEIT | [2014/28] | English: | A GROOVE STRIP FOR MOUNTING OF A SHEET UNIT | [2014/28] | French: | GORGE POUR LE MONTAGE D'UN PANNEAU | [2014/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 16.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/34] | 05.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2228966 (SPECTUS UPVC SYSTEMS LTD [GB]); | [XA]DE19546346 (SCHWEIZER AG E [CH]); | [XI]EP0942140 (RAVN VINDUER & DORE A S [DK]); | [X]DE10029391 (SFS HANDELS HOLDING AG HEERBRU [CH]) | International search | [A]SE462723 (ELIT FOENSTER AB [SE]); | [A]NL1022030C (DOORWIN B V [NL]); | [A]WO2005028800 (VKR HOLDING AS [DK], et al); | [A]SE531015 (STEELFORM SCANDINAVIA AB [SE]) |