17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
10.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
30.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
20.10.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
14.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
16.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
09.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
11.11.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.11.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.11.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.10.2016 |
Change - inventor |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
02.09.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] |
26.08.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
22.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.09.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] |
21.08.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.01.2015 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
23.01.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
23.01.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
31.10.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
22.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.11.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
15.11.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
15.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.09.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.03.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|