EP2747836 - FACIAL REJUVINATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scerbo, Louis 21 Edgewater Avenue Nutley, NJ 07110 / US | [2014/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/17] |
Former [2014/27] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12828859.4 | 24.08.2012 | [2017/17] | WO2012US52251 | Priority number, date | US201161527651P | 26.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161527651 P | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013032897 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2747836 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2747836 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/18, A61H23/00 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
A61H23/02 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0107 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0138 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0157 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0207 (EP,US);
A61H2201/105 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1654 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1676 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5007 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/27] | A61N1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESICHTSVERJÜNGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/27] | English: | FACIAL REJUVINATING APPARATUS | [2014/27] | French: | APPAREIL DE RAJEUNISSEMENT FACIAL | [2014/27] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 20.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.08.2012 | AL | 26.04.2017 | AT | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | HR | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | MK | 26.04.2017 | NL | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | RS | 26.04.2017 | SE | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | SM | 26.04.2017 | TR | 26.04.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | NO | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | GB | 24.08.2017 | IE | 24.08.2017 | LU | 24.08.2017 | MT | 24.08.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 24.08.2012 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
IE | 24.08.2017 | ||
LU | 24.08.2017 | ||
MT | 24.08.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 24.08.2012 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
IE | 24.08.2017 | ||
LU | 24.08.2017 | ||
MT | 24.08.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 24.08.2012 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
IE | 24.08.2017 | ||
LU | 24.08.2017 | ||
MT | 24.08.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 24.08.2012 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
IE | 24.08.2017 | ||
LU | 24.08.2017 | ||
MT | 24.08.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.08.2012 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
IE | 24.08.2017 | ||
LU | 24.08.2017 | ||
MT | 24.08.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
IE | 24.08.2017 | ||
LU | 24.08.2017 | ||
MT | 24.08.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
IE | 24.08.2017 | ||
LU | 24.08.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
GB | 24.08.2017 | ||
IE | 24.08.2017 | ||
LU | 24.08.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 24.08.2017 | ||
LU | 24.08.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 26.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2009254014 (SON GI-JUN [KR]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 7-11; | [XY]JP2005118527 (KUMAKAWA KEIICHI) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 7-11; | [Y]US2004025243 (CHIEN GHEN-JUNG [TW]) [Y] 7-11 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO2006138298 (EARTHLITE MASSAGE TABLES INC [US], et al) [Y] 7-11 * figures 1-8; claims 1-39 *; | [Y]US2634435 (LEIGHTON BUDD) [Y] 7-11 * figures 1-5; claims 1-4 * | International search | [Y]US4052981 (BACHMANN); | [Y]US4732140 (STOFFREGEN); | [A]US5072724 (MARCUS); | [A]US3323517 (KELLER); | [A]US5928262 (HARBER) |