Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8956572 | ![]() | 17.02.2015 | B2 | US2013164400 | 27.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | US201213669217 | 05.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9579338 | ![]() | 28.02.2017 | B2 | US2013115274 | 09.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US63457 | 02.11.2012 | US201213669078 | 05.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10155945 | ![]() | 18.12.2018 | B2 | US2017152516 | 01.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US63457 | 02.11.2012 | US201213669078 | 05.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | US201715430387 | 10.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102056702B | ![]() | 17.12.2019 | B1 | KR20140097276 | 06.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | WO2012IB03109 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102046968B | ![]() | 02.12.2019 | B1 | KR20140101748 | 20.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6133883B | ![]() | 24.05.2017 | B2 | JP2015502345 | 22.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | WO2012IB03109 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6149041B | ![]() | 14.06.2017 | B2 | JP2014534232 | 18.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3673898 | ![]() | 01.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | EP12848760 | 02.11.2012 | WO2012IB03109 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3485875 | ![]() | 22.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | EP12829180 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2773328 | ![]() | 10.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | WO2012IB03109 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103906504B | ![]() | 17.11.2017 | B | CN103906504 | 02.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | WO2012IB03109 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103906503B | ![]() | 14.12.2016 | B | CN103906503 | 02.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2853689 | ![]() | 30.06.2020 | C | CA2853689 | 27.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | WO2012IB03109 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2853685 | ![]() | 03.09.2019 | C | CA2853685 | 10.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012356239B | ![]() | 22.09.2016 | B2 | AU2012356239 | 29.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | WO2012IB03109 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012330819B | ![]() | 31.08.2017 | B2 | AU2012330819 | 15.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2773326 | ![]() | 20.02.2019 | B1 | EP2773326 | 10.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1121495T | 29.05.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2773326T | 15.04.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2721325T | 31.07.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20190481T | 03.05.2019 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | EP12829180 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2773326T | 25.04.2019 | T | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2773326T | 28.06.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | EP12829180 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS58562 | 31.05.2019 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | EP12829180 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2647476 | 15.03.2018 | C2 | RU2014122432 | 10.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | WO2012IB03109 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2642640 | 25.01.2018 | C2 | RU2014122433 | 10.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2773326T | 30.04.2019 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | EP12829180 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT201900197T | 10.05.2019 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB02916 | 02.11.2012 | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | EP12829180 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013093648 | ![]() | 24.10.2013 | A3 | WO2013093648 | 27.06.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013064911 | ![]() | 24.10.2013 | A3 | WO2013064911 | 10.05.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6442551B | ![]() | 19.12.2018 | B2 | JP2017165748 | 21.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE043809T | 30.09.2019 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2773326T | 23.04.2019 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR201904389T | 22.04.2019 | T4 | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI618548B | 21.03.2018 | B | TW201323020 | 16.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI615156B | 21.02.2018 | B | TW201325634 | 01.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI626952B | 21.06.2018 | B | TW201731491 | 16.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161556124 | 04.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | EP3485875 |