|
09.06.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2020 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2018 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.2018 |
Registration under Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Brief communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2018 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2018 |
Registration under Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2018 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Extension of time limit granted |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Extension of time limit granted |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2018 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Extension of time limit granted |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2017 |
Deficiencies as to Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2017 |
Rule 23 - Annex A |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2017 |
Rule 23 - Annex B |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2017 |
Rule 23 - Annex C |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2017 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
18.09.2017 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2016 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2014 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
26 |