EP2753774 - TORSION BAR DOOR CHECK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MULTIMATIC INC. 8688 Woodbine Avenue Suite 200 Markham, Ontario L3R 8B9 / CA | [2018/34] |
Former [2014/29] | For all designated states MULTIMATIC INC. 85 Valleywood Drive Markham, Ontario L3R 5E5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRUBER, Rudolf 12 Hillborne Court R.R. 4 Uxbridge, Ontario L9P 1R4 / CA | [2014/29] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2018/22] |
Former [2014/29] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12830055.5 | 06.09.2012 | [2018/22] | WO2012CA50614 | Priority number, date | US201113226348 | 06.09.2011 Original published format: US201113226348 | [2014/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013033843 | Date: | 14.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2753774 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2753774 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 14.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E05C17/20, E05F5/00, // E05B15/04 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
E05C17/203 (EP,KR,US);
E05B2015/0455 (EP,KR,US);
E05Y2900/531 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2014/29] | E05C17/20, E05F5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREHSTABTÜRHALTER | [2014/29] | English: | TORSION BAR DOOR CHECK | [2014/29] | French: | FERME-PORTE À BARRE DE TORSION | [2014/29] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 17.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.09.2012 | AL | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | FI | 30.05.2018 | HR | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | MK | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | PL | 30.05.2018 | PT | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | RS | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | SM | 30.05.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | NO | 30.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | IE | 06.09.2018 | LU | 06.09.2018 | MT | 06.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 06.09.2012 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MK | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 06.09.2012 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 30.05.2018 | |
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9202108U (SIEGMULLER GMBH) [A] 1* page 7; figures 2-3 *; | [AD]EP1759080 (FINGSCHEIDT GMBH FRIEDR [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]GB795867 (STANDARD PRESSED STEEL CO); | [A]EP0111380 (BLOXVICH LOCK STAMPING [GB]); | [A]US5026103 (TOELLE KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al); | [A]WO03042477 (VENTRA GROUP INC [CA]); | [A]WO2009124373 (MULTIMATIC INC [CA], et al) | by applicant | WO2006000536 |