10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
05.04.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
14.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
20.07.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
27.04.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
23.04.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
20.04.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.04.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.02.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.01.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.01.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
08.12.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
08.12.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
15.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.08.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.04.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.03.2017 |
First examination report |
|
30.09.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.02.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
19.02.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
19.02.2016 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
16.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.11.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
03.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.06.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.07.2014 [2014/29] |
13.06.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.07.2014 [2014/29] |
20.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.02.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.02.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.04.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.03.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|