Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8869350 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2014 | B2 | US2013055530 | 07.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113226348 | 06.09.2011 | US201213605582 | 06.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101972406B | Global Dossier | 25.04.2019 | B1 | KR20140073491 | 16.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113226348 | 06.09.2011 | WO2012CA50614 | 06.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5970069B | Global Dossier | 17.08.2016 | B2 | JP2014526622 | 06.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113226348 | 06.09.2011 | WO2012CA50614 | 06.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103890299B | Global Dossier | 17.08.2016 | B | CN103890299 | 25.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113226348 | 06.09.2011 | WO2012CA50614 | 06.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2846308 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2019 | C | CA2846308 | 14.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113226348 | 06.09.2011 | WO2012CA50614 | 06.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012307003B | Global Dossier | 02.02.2017 | B2 | AU2012307003 | 27.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113226348 | 06.09.2011 | WO2012CA50614 | 06.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2753774 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2018 | B1 | EP2753774 | 23.03.2016 | A4 | EP2753774 | 16.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113226348 | 06.09.2011 | WO2012CA50614 | 06.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014004470 | 23.02.2021 | B1 | BR112014004470 | 28.03.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201113226348 | 06.09.2011 | WO2012CA50614 | 06.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2683879T | 28.09.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201113226348 | 06.09.2011 | WO2012CA50614 | 06.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX348086 | 24.05.2017 | B | MX2014002602 | 24.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113226348 | 06.09.2011 | WO2012CA50614 | 06.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2587559 | 20.06.2016 | C2 | RU2014111330 | 20.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113226348 | 06.09.2011 | WO2012CA50614 | 06.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013033843 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113226348 | 06.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013055529 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113226348 | 06.09.2011 |