EP2755006 - CONTAINER LIQUID LEAK INSPECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suntory Holdings Limited 1-40 Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8203 / JP | [2014/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI Toshiya c/o Suntory World Headquaters 3-3, Daiba 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 135-8631 / JP | 02 /
IIZUKA Toshiaki c/o Suntory World Headquaters 3-3, Daiba 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 135-8631 / JP | 03 /
TAMURA Kosuke c/o Suntory World Headquaters 3-3, Daiba 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 135-8631 / JP | 04 /
SAKURAI Takuya c/o Suntory World Headquaters 3-3, Daiba 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 135-8631 / JP | [2014/29] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/15] |
Former [2014/29] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12830500.0 | 07.09.2012 | [2017/15] | WO2012JP72910 | Priority number, date | JP20110196479 | 08.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011196479 | [2014/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013035846 | Date: | 14.03.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2755006 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2755006 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/38 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
G01M3/38 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/29] | G01M3/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR INSPEKTION VON FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTERN AUF UNDICHTIGKEIT | [2014/29] | English: | CONTAINER LIQUID LEAK INSPECTION DEVICE | [2014/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INSPECTION DE FUITE DE LIQUIDE DE RÉCIPIENT | [2014/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2014 | Translation filed | 26.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 08.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2012 | AL | 12.04.2017 | AT | 12.04.2017 | CY | 12.04.2017 | CZ | 12.04.2017 | DK | 12.04.2017 | EE | 12.04.2017 | FI | 12.04.2017 | HR | 12.04.2017 | LT | 12.04.2017 | LV | 12.04.2017 | MC | 12.04.2017 | MK | 12.04.2017 | NL | 12.04.2017 | PL | 12.04.2017 | PT | 12.04.2017 | RO | 12.04.2017 | RS | 12.04.2017 | SE | 12.04.2017 | SI | 12.04.2017 | SK | 12.04.2017 | SM | 12.04.2017 | TR | 12.04.2017 | BG | 12.07.2017 | NO | 12.07.2017 | GR | 13.07.2017 | IS | 12.08.2017 | IE | 07.09.2017 | LU | 07.09.2017 | MT | 07.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 07.09.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 07.09.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 07.09.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.09.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.09.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 12.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JP2007071568 (MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO LTD) [I] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [Y] 3; | [A]JPS636432 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] *; | [A]JPH07333171 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US2009139911 (LISEC RONALD [US] ET AL) [Y] 3 * figure 11 *; | [A]FR2803035 (LABEDZ DANIEL [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]JP2007071568 (MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000310577 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JPH07333171 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPS636432 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2002286581 (NISSHIN DENSHI KOGYO KK) | by applicant | JP2000009578 |