EP2764297 - INTEGRATED BUILDING BASED AIR HANDLER FOR SERVER FARM COOLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.01.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Excalibur IP, LLC 140 East 45th Street, 15th Floor New York, NY 10017 / US | [2018/07] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states Excalibur IP, LLC 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states Yahoo! Inc. 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOTEBOOM, Scott 6047 Montalvo Drive San Jose, CA 95123 / US | 02 /
ROBISON, Albert, Dell 25560 Hillside Road Los Gatos, CA 95033 / US | [2014/33] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 12831738.5 | 17.08.2012 | WO2012US51270 | Priority number, date | US201113230809 | 12.09.2011 Original published format: US201113230809 | [2014/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013039645 | Date: | 21.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2764297 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F24F7/10, F24F7/06, H01L21/02 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
H05K7/20745 (EP,US);
F24F11/0001 (EP,US);
F24F7/02 (US);
H05K7/20309 (US);
H05K7/20736 (US);
H05K7/20836 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Title | German: | AUF EINEM INTEGRIERTEN GEHÄUSE BASIERENDE LUFTBEARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN SERVERFARM-KÜHLSYSTEM | [2014/33] | English: | INTEGRATED BUILDING BASED AIR HANDLER FOR SERVER FARM COOLING SYSTEM | [2014/33] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE L'AIR À CONSTRUCTION INTÉGRÉE, POUR SYSTÈME DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE BATTERIE DE SERVEURS | [2014/33] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 08.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/21] | 12.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/21] | Divisional application(s) | EP18162564.1 / EP3367771 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2011009047 (NOTEBOOM SCOTT [US], et al) [I] 1-11* figures 1-9 * | International search | [Y]JPH08210685 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2002039585 (KAMAKURA SEISAKUSHO KK); | [X]US2011009047 (NOTEBOOM SCOTT [US], et al); | [A]JP2011159144 (YAHOO JAPAN CORP) |