EP2756465 - GENERATING, DISPLAYING, AND TRACKING OF WELLNESS TASKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Worksmart Labs, Inc. 530 W 25th Street Suite 502 New York, New York 10001 / US | [2014/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETAKOV, Artem 2103 8th Avenue Apt. 5A New York, New York 10026 / US | 02 /
SIMON, Mark 303 10th Avenue 3B New York, New York 10001 / US | 03 /
GUNNARSSON, Ketill 93 St. John's Place Apt. 2 Brooklyn, New York 11217 / US | 04 /
LIN, Chow 1800 Adam Clayton Powell Jr. Blvd. Apt. 6A New York, New York 10026 / US | 05 /
SHAFRANOVICH, Gennadiy 1625 Emmons Avenue, 1K Brooklyn, New York 11235 / US | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | Kramer, Dani, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Kramer, Dani, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12832222.9 | 14.09.2012 | WO2012US55548 | Priority number, date | US201161534855P | 14.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161534855 P | [2014/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013040440 | Date: | 21.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2756465 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
G16H20/60 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (KR);
G01G19/44 (KR,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06Q50/22 (KR);
G09B19/00 (US);
G16H20/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG, ANZEIGE, UND VERFOLGUNG VON AUFGABEN FÜR DAS WOHLBEFINDEN | [2014/30] | English: | GENERATING, DISPLAYING, AND TRACKING OF WELLNESS TASKS | [2014/30] | French: | GÉNÉRER, AFFICHER, ET POURSUIVRE LE MIEUX-ÊTRE | [2014/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 04.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 23.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5673691 (ABRAMS PHILIP S [US], et al) [I] 1-15* column 11, lines 18-42 * | International search | [X]US5673691 (ABRAMS PHILIP S [US], et al); | [A]US2003130595 (MAULT JAMES R [US]); | [A]US2010079291 (KROLL RYAN [US], et al); | [A]WO2010045660 (KOWENSKY JONATHAN [ZA]); | [A]US2011087137 (HANOUN REED [CA]) |