EP2807801 - SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR SPAM DETECTION USING FREQUENCY SPECTRA OF CHARACTER STRINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bitdefender IPR Management Ltd. Kreontos 12 1076 Nicosia / CY | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | For all designated states Bitdefender IPR Management Ltd. Kreontos 12 1076 Nicosa / CY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DICHIU, Daniel Str. Piata Amzei nr. 10-22 sc. D et. 7 ap. 73 sector 1 Bucuresti / RO | 02 /
LUPESCU, Z. Lucian Str. Nita Elinescu nr. 60A Sector 3 Bucuresti / RO | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Tuluca, F. Doina Cabinet Doina Tuluca Bd. Lacul Tei 56 Bl.19, sc.B, ap 52, sector 2 020392 Bucuresti / RO | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Tuluca, F. Doina Cabinet Doina Tuluca Bd. Lacul Tei 56 Bl.19, sc.B, ap 52, sector 2 RO-020392 Bucuresti / RO | Application number, filing date | 12832750.9 | 05.09.2012 | WO2012RO00022 | Priority number, date | US201213358338 | 25.01.2012 Original published format: US201213358338 | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013112061 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2807801 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
H04L51/212 (EP,KR,RU,US);
G06F16/93 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04L51/00 (RU);
H04W4/16 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Extension states | BA | 22.07.2014 | ME | 22.07.2014 | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SPAM-ERKENNUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON SPEKTREN VON ZEICHENKETTEN | [2014/49] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR SPAM DETECTION USING FREQUENCY SPECTRA OF CHARACTER STRINGS | [2014/49] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION DE SPAMS AU MOYEN DE SPECTRES DE FRÉQUENCE DE CHAÎNE DE CARACTÈRES | [2014/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/39] | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.12.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]US2010333200 (CHEN XIAO YAN [CN], et al) [I] 1,14,27-29 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 96 * [Y] 2-13,15-26; | [Y]US8001195 (KALININ ANDREY L [RU]) [Y] 2-13,15-26* column 1, line 8 - column 8, line 14 * |