EP2746032 - FLAT TIRE REPAIR KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIGUCHI Norio c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd. 6-9 Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | 02 /
KONO Tsutomu c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd. 6-9 Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12832880.4 | 06.09.2012 | WO2012JP72719 | Priority number, date | JP20110204967 | 20.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011204967 | [2014/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013042545 | Date: | 28.03.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2746032 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B29C73/16, // B29L30/00 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
B29C73/166 (EP,US);
B29C73/025 (US);
B29L2030/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/26] | B29C73/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Title | German: | REPARATURSATZ FÜR PLATTE REIFEN | [2014/26] | English: | FLAT TIRE REPAIR KIT | [2014/26] | French: | KIT DE RÉPARATION DE PNEU À PLAT | [2014/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2014 | Translation filed | 20.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 20.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/36] | 30.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2008162070 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1* figures 3-6 *; | [XA]EP2123432 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0034] , [0036] , [0043] - [0046] - [0054] * * figures 1-3,5 * [A] 2-11 | International search | [A]JP2007168418 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]JP2010089273 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]JP2010184354 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]JP2011098463 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) |