EP2759582 - COMPOSITION HAVING ENHANCED CORROSION RESISTANCE AND PH BUFFERING PROPERTY FOR ANTIFREEZE LIQUID OR COOLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kukdong Jeyen Company Limited 1173-4 Wonjeong-ri Poseung-eup Pyeongtaek City, Gyeonggi-do 451-822 / KR | [2014/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Jae Yoon 111-406, Hanbomido Mansion 511, Daechi-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-837 / KR | 02 /
JO, Chang Yeol 103-1902 Daewoo Apt. 1552 Dadae-dong Saha-gu Busan 604-050 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Dong Yeol 307-1006 Booyoung 2-cha Apt. Segyo-dong Pyeongtaek City Gyeonggi-do 450-744 / KR | [2014/31] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2019/10] |
Former [2014/31] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Application number, filing date | 12832969.5 | 31.01.2012 | [2019/10] | WO2012KR00753 | Priority number, date | KR20110096239 | 23.09.2011 Original published format: KR 20110096239 | [2014/31] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013042837 | Date: | 28.03.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2759582 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2759582 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/20, C23F11/08 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
C09K5/20 (EP,KR,US);
C23F11/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/31] | C09K5/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VERBESSERTER KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGKEIT UND PH-PUFFERUNGSEIGENSCHAFT FÜR FROSTSCHUTZMITTEL ODER KÜHLMITTEL | [2014/31] | English: | COMPOSITION HAVING ENHANCED CORROSION RESISTANCE AND PH BUFFERING PROPERTY FOR ANTIFREEZE LIQUID OR COOLANT | [2014/31] | French: | COMPOSITION AYANT UNE RÉSISTANCE ACCRUE À LA CORROSION ET PROPRIÉTÉ DE TAMPONNEMENT DE PH POUR UN LIQUIDE ANTIGEL OU UN RÉFRIGÉRANT | [2014/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2014 | Translation filed | 23.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 07.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2012 | AL | 06.03.2019 | AT | 06.03.2019 | CY | 06.03.2019 | DK | 06.03.2019 | EE | 06.03.2019 | ES | 06.03.2019 | FI | 06.03.2019 | HR | 06.03.2019 | IT | 06.03.2019 | LT | 06.03.2019 | LV | 06.03.2019 | MC | 06.03.2019 | MK | 06.03.2019 | MT | 06.03.2019 | NL | 06.03.2019 | PL | 06.03.2019 | RO | 06.03.2019 | RS | 06.03.2019 | SE | 06.03.2019 | SI | 06.03.2019 | SM | 06.03.2019 | BG | 06.06.2019 | NO | 06.06.2019 | GR | 07.06.2019 | IS | 06.07.2019 | PT | 06.07.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 31.01.2012 | |
AL | 06.03.2019 | ||
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
MT | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 06.03.2019 | |
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 06.03.2019 | |
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4105405 (WEHLE VOLKER, et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]US5085791 (BURNS JEFFREY M [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 34 * * examples 1, 2 * * claims 1-23 *; | [Y]US6802988 (WENDEROTH BERND [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2007007489 (EGAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 1, paragraph 9 - page 3, paragraph 38 * * page 3, paragraph 39 - page 4, paragraph 47; examples 2, 4; tables 1, 2 * * page 4; examples 7, 8; tables 3, 4 * * claims 1-9 *; | [Y]EP1829949 (SHISHIAI KK [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * page 2, paragraph 9 - page 4, paragraph 27 * * page 4; example 3; tables 1,3 * * claims 1-5 *; | [Y]JP2007269834 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-3,5-7 * abstract *; | [Y]KR20100018754 (KUKDONG JEYEN CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS624774 (UBE INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPH0641584B (UBE INDUSTRIES); | [Y]US2007007489 (EGAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2007269834 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD, et al); | [A]US2008141900 (HUANG KEKUN [CN]); | [Y]KR20100018754 (KUKDONG JEYEN CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US4598205 | US4647392 | US4657689 | US4873011 | US5064552 | US5422026 | JPH09263976 | JP2000219981 | JP2001098258 | JP2001279235 | JP2002038137 |