Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2758621 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2758621



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(55)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 192
16.07.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
07.02.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
07.02.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.05.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.05.2018 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
16.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.08.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.08.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
16.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.08.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.07.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
29.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.06.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.04.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
19.04.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.04.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
23.12.2016 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
13.12.2016 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
13.12.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.11.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
22.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
22.11.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 11
22.11.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 11
22.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.11.2016 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
13.09.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
27.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.06.2016 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
15.12.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
14.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.12.2015 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.11.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.11.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
27.11.2015 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
27.11.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
17.11.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
28.10.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
28.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.05.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
24.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.04.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
17.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.03.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
31.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
16.05.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
16.05.2013 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
15.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
28.03.2013 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 40