EP2757923 - SOUND PILLOW SLEEP SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Armbruster Enterprises, Inc. 1123 Patricia San Antonio, TX / US | [2014/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARMBRUSTER, Robert, Scott 1410 Horizon Circle San Antonio, TX 78258 / US | [2014/31] | Representative(s) | Rasch, Michael Rösler - Rasch - van der Heide & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Bodenseestrasse 18 81241 München / DE | [2018/30] |
Former [2014/31] | Rasch, Michael Rösler Rasch & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bodenseestrasse 18 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12833083.4 | 20.09.2012 | [2018/30] | WO2012US56360 | Priority number, date | US201161538430P | 23.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161538430 P | [2014/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013043885 | Date: | 28.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2757923 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2757923 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47G9/10, A61M21/02, H04R25/00, G10K11/175, // A61M21/00, H04R1/02 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
A61M21/02 (EP,US);
A47G9/1045 (EP,US);
B68G7/00 (US);
G10K11/175 (EP,US);
H04R25/75 (EP,US);
H04R5/023 (US);
A61M2021/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3561 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8206 (EP,US);
A61M2207/00 (EP,US);
F04C2270/041 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/17] | A47G9/10, A61M21/02, H04R25/00, G10K11/175, // A61M21/00 | ||
Former IPC [2014/31] | A47G9/10, H04R5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLAFSYSTEM MIT EINEM KLANGKISSEN | [2014/31] | English: | SOUND PILLOW SLEEP SYSTEM | [2014/31] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SOMMEIL À OREILLER SONORE | [2014/31] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 25.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 25.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.02.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 25.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.09.2012 | AL | 25.07.2018 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | HR | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | MK | 25.07.2018 | NL | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | PT | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | RS | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | SM | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | IE | 20.09.2018 | LU | 20.09.2018 | MT | 20.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | NO | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 20.09.2012 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 20.09.2018 | ||
LU | 20.09.2018 | ||
MT | 20.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 20.09.2018 | ||
LU | 20.09.2018 | ||
MT | 20.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 20.09.2018 | ||
LU | 20.09.2018 | ||
MT | 20.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 20.09.2018 | ||
LU | 20.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 20.09.2018 | ||
LU | 20.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 20.09.2018 | ||
LU | 20.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 20.09.2018 | ||
LU | 20.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 20.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | |
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 25.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB293911 (HOWARD KAJAN DE LACY) [Y] 1-16 * page 1, line 5 - line 44 * * page 1, line 53 - line 69 * * page 1, line 82 - page 2, line 23 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]WO8704630 (NILSSON SVEN ERIK, et al) [Y] 2-10,12,16 * page 1, line 3 - page 2, line 5 * * page 2, line 13 - page 5, line 12 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [XY]AU642117B (JOHN BORG) [X] 1-3,5,11,13-15 * page 2, line 1 - page 2A, line 4 * * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 24 * * figures 1-5 * * cited in the international search report * [Y] 1-16; | [Y]US5325436 (SOLI SIGFRID D [US], et al) [Y] 3-10 * column 1, line 8 - column 2, line 55 * * column 3, line 26 - column 6, line 6 * * column 6, line 15 - line 44 * * column 10, line 1 - line 11 * * figures 1, 2, 4A-5B, 10A-10B *; | [Y]EP1035753 (ROSICA NINO [IT], et al) [Y] 2-10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0071] *; | [Y]WO0056120 (UNIV CURTIN TECH [AU], et al) [Y] 2-10 * page 1, line 5 - page 6, line 22 * * page 7, line 17 - page 19, line 3 * * page 20, line 8 - page 26, line 5 * * figures 2, 4-7 *; | [XYI]US2009089931 (VANDENBELT RUDY A [CA]) [X] 1-3,5,11,13,15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023] * * figures 1-4 * * cited in the international search report * [Y] 1-16 [I] 14; | [Y]WO2009135107 (SONITUS MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [Y] 2-10,12,16 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0085] * * figures 3, 4 *; | [YP]US2011280429 (HSIEH CHUNG-HSIN [TW]) [YP] 12,16 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0032] ** figures 1, 2 * | International search | [Y]US4782533 (HAYNIE JAMES L [US]); | [Y]US5201002 (DAHLEM ROBERT L [US]); | [X]AU642117B (JOHN BORG); | [A]US6044161 (LEE KEITH [US]); | [A]US2009089931 (VANDENBELT RUDY A [CA]); | [Y]US2010097197 (SOWADA MARK [US]) | by applicant | AU642117B | US2009089931 |