EP2759152 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING EMBEDDING OF LOCAL IDENTIFIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/31] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRKEBY, Ole Yläkartanonkuja 2 C 62 02360 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | 01 /
KIRKEBY, Ole Yläkartanonkuja 2 C 62 FI-02360 Espoo / FI | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Tognetty, Virpi Maria Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02160 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 12833220.2 | 21.08.2012 | WO2012FI50797 | Priority number, date | US201113243240 | 23.09.2011 Original published format: US201113243240 | [2014/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013041758 | Date: | 28.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2759152 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 28.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/414, H04N21/4223, H04N21/442, H04N21/4788 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
H04N21/4223 (EP,US);
H04N21/44227 (EP,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/24] | H04W4/18, H04W8/00, H04N21/414, H04N21/4223, H04N21/442, H04N21/4788 | ||
Former IPC [2014/31] | H04W4/18, H04W8/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER EINBETTUNG LOKALER IDENTIFIKATOREN | [2014/31] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING EMBEDDING OF LOCAL IDENTIFIERS | [2014/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR RÉALISER L'INCLUSION D'IDENTIFIANTS LOCAUX | [2014/31] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 29.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/02] | 24.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010191728 (REILLY JAMES FRANCIS [FI], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0050] * * figure 4 *; | [X]US2011209221 (HANSON ERIC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0064] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2011102444 (MATSUMOTO TOMOKO [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0146] * * figures 2-6 *; | [A]US2010171805 (RON URI [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 2-8 *; | [A]US2011050564 (ALBERTH WILLIAM P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0025]; figure 3 *; | [A]EP2352287 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0075] *; | [A]JP2009181210 (NTT DOCOMO INC) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2006187228 (JUNG EDWARD K [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0136] *; | [A]JP2011035657 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [X]WO2005043270 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [X]WO2009068089 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [X]WO2007036842 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]WO2008048186 (OGHMA PTE LTD [SG], et al); | [A]US7551913 (CHIEN HERMAN [US]); | [A]GB2462163 (REDZEBRA MOBILE LTD [GB]) | Examination | US2010291952 | by applicant | US2010191728 | US2011209221 | US2011102444 |