EP2761428 - CONVEYANCE OF CONFIGURATION INFORMATION IN A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apperian, Inc. 321 Summer Street Boston, Massachusetts 02210 / US | [2014/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDMAN, Robert U. 6 Samuel Harrington Road Westborough, MA 01581 / US | 02 /
CRAVER, Shawn P. 83 Blair Road Willington, CT 06279 / US | 03 /
MARTIN, Glenn R. 500 Falls Blvd 2302 Quincy, MA 02169 / US | [2014/32] | Representative(s) | Burt, Matthew Thomas, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [2014/32] | Application number, filing date | 12834657.4 | 26.09.2012 | WO2012US57282 | Priority number, date | US201161540210P | 28.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161540210 P | [2014/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013049163 | Date: | 04.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2761428 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/04 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
H04L41/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Title | German: | TRANSPORT VON KONFIGURATIONSINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM NETZWERK | [2014/32] | English: | CONVEYANCE OF CONFIGURATION INFORMATION IN A NETWORK | [2014/32] | French: | TRANSPORT D'INFORMATIONS DE CONFIGURATION DANS UN RÉSEAU | [2014/32] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/25] | 09.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6119157 (TRAVERSAT BERNARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 6 ** column 4, line 48 - line 59 *; | [XI]US6973499 (PEDEN GEORGE H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 3, line 39 - column 8, line 57; figure 1 * [I] 3-8; | [XI]US2010138905 (KASS ERIC [DE]) [X] 1,9,10 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] * [I] 2-8 | International search | [A]US2002109718 (MANSOUR PETER M [US], et al); | [Y]US2005039178 (MAROLIA SUNIL [US], et al); | [Y]US2010023520 (BARBOY DMITRY [IL], et al) |