EP2761408 - FINGER STYLUS FOR USE WITH CAPACITIVE TOUCH PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nano Nails LLC 1 Medical Park Drive Helena, Montana 59601 / US | [2014/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VELLANKI, Latha 1 Medical Park Drive Helena, Montana 59601 / US | [2014/32] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Meldrum, David James D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12835384.4 | 26.09.2012 | WO2012US57309 | Priority number, date | US201161539195P | 26.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161539195 P | [2014/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013049185 | Date: | 04.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2761408 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033, G06F3/039, G06F3/044, G06F3/0354 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
G06F3/0393 (EP,US);
G06F3/03545 (US);
G06F3/044 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/32] | G06F3/033 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Title | German: | FINGERSCHREIBSTIFT ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT KAPAZITIVEN BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRMEN | [2014/32] | English: | FINGER STYLUS FOR USE WITH CAPACITIVE TOUCH PANELS | [2014/32] | French: | STYLET DIGITAL À UTILISER AVEC DES PANNEAUX TACTILES CAPACITIFS | [2014/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 22.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2009278818 (DINOZZI JON MARIO [US], et al) [X] 1,5,9-13,15 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0058] * * figures 1-5, 17 * [Y] 2-4,6 [I] 7,8,14; | [YA]US2010039392 (PRATT JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0056] * * figure 8 * [A] 1-5,7-15; | [Y]US6075189 (ROBB KARL A [US]) [Y] 2-4 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 17 *; | [A]US2005093835 (MORTARELLI JOHN R [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US2008297493 (ADKINS GORDON K [US]); | [Y]US2008106521 (NAVE DENISE DARLENE [US]); | [A]US6249277 (VARVERIS NICHOLAS G [US]); | [A]KR20110091932 (YANG WON DONG [KR]); | [A]KR20110093018 (CHOI SEUNG CHUL [KR]) | by applicant | US2009278818 | US2010039392 | US6075189 | US2005093835 | US2008297493 | US2008106521 | US6249277 | KR20110091932 | KR20110093018 |