EP2761004 - BIOLOGICAL METHODS FOR PREPARING ADIPIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verdezyne, Inc. 2715 Loker Avenue West Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | [2014/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PICATAGGIO, Stephen 2715 Loker Avenue West Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | 02 /
BEARDSLEE, Tom 2715 Loker Avenue West Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | [2014/32] | Representative(s) | Ali, Suleman, et al Avidity IP Limited Broers Building, Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Longland, Emma Louise, et al avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12835489.1 | 21.09.2012 | WO2012US56562 | Priority number, date | US201113245780 | 26.09.2011 Original published format: US201113245780 | US201113245782 | 26.09.2011 Original published format: US201113245782 | [2014/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013048898 | Date: | 04.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2761004 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/40, C12N15/52, C12N15/81 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
C12P7/44 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/32] | C12N15/52, C12N15/81, C12P7/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ADIPINSÄURE | [2014/32] | English: | BIOLOGICAL METHODS FOR PREPARING ADIPIC ACID | [2014/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉS BIOLOGIQUES DE PRÉPARATION D'ACIDE ADIPIQUE | [2014/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 19.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 02.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - BEARDSLEE ET AL, "S120: Engineering Candida tropicalis to produce adipic acid from renewable feedstocks", Conference proceedings, (201107), page 1, SIM annual meeting and exhibition, New Orleans, LA, July 24-28, 2011, URL: https://sim.confex.com/sim/2011/webprogram/Paper19217.html, (20150612), XP002740839 [L] * See Abstract (the full disclosure at the conference may be more relevant) * | [AP] - N.N. (UNIVERSITY OF IOWA), "Renewable nylon: Engineering yeast for the production of adipic acid", BIOCAT BEAT, (201112), vol. 2, pages 1 - 6, XP002740807 [AP] 1-15 * See page 3 (related to a conference in October, 2011) * | International search | [A]US2003087403 (CHENG QIONG [US], et al); | [A]US2003113886 (BRZOSTOWICZ PATRICIA C [US], et al); | [Y]US2010291653 (NESS JON E [US], et al); | [Y]WO2011003034 (VERDEZYNE INC [US], et al); | [XP]WO2012094425 (VERDEZYNE INC [US], et al) |