EP2764079 - MICROELECTRONIC SUBSTRATE CLEANING COMPOSITIONS HAVING COPPER/AZOLE POLYMER INHIBITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avantor Performance Materials, Inc. 3477 Corporate Parkway, Suite 200 Center Valley PA 18034 / US | [2014/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSU, Chien-Pin, Sherman 85 Colombia Avenue Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922 / US | [2014/33] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2014/33] | Application number, filing date | 12838061.5 | 05.10.2012 | WO2012US58976 | Priority number, date | US201161626915P | 05.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161626915 P | [2014/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013052809 | Date: | 11.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2764079 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C11D7/32, C11D3/00, C11D7/26, C11D7/34, C11D7/50, C11D11/00, G03F7/42, H01L21/02, H01L21/311 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
C11D3/0073 (EP,US);
G03F7/425 (US);
C11D7/261 (EP,US);
C11D7/265 (EP,US);
C11D7/3281 (EP,US);
C11D7/34 (EP,US);
C11D7/5022 (EP,US);
H01L21/02057 (EP,US);
H01L21/31133 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/33] | C11D7/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Title | German: | MIKROELEKTRONISCHE SUBSTRATREINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT KUPFER-/AZOLPOLYMERHEMMUNG | [2014/33] | English: | MICROELECTRONIC SUBSTRATE CLEANING COMPOSITIONS HAVING COPPER/AZOLE POLYMER INHIBITION | [2014/33] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE NETTOYAGE DE SUBSTRATS MICROÉLECTRONIQUES AYANT UNE INHIBITION DE POLYMÈRE CUIVRE/AZOLE | [2014/33] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 23.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/41] | 30.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003144162 (CHAE GEE-SUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-18 * example -; claim - *; | [I]WO2005093032 (MALLINCKRODT BAKER INC [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0041] , [0061]; example -; claim -; tables 14,17 *; | [A]WO2007044446 (ADVANCED TECH MATERIALS [US], et al) [A] 1-18* example -; claim - * | International search | [X]US6558879 (PETERS DARRYL W [US], et al); | [Y]US2011034362 (EGBE MATTHEW I [US]) |