EP2764467 - IMAGING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR USE IN SURGICAL AND INTERVENTIONAL MEDICAL PROCEDURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NuVasive, Inc. 7475 Lusk Boulevard San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2024/10] |
Former [2017/13] | For all designated states NuVasive, Inc. 7475 Lusk Boulevard San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
Former [2014/42] | For all designated states SafeRay Spine LLC 5102 Durham Chapel Hill Blvd Suite 203 Durham, NC 27707 / US | ||
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states Minispine, Inc. 9695 San Vittore Street Lake Worth, FL 33467 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISAACS, Robert, E. 811 Oxbow Crossing Road Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | 02 /
JOHNSTON, Samuel, Morris 92 Forest Oaks Drive Durham, NC 27705 / US | [2014/33] | Representative(s) | Morabito, Sara Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | [2024/10] |
Former [2014/33] | Ponchiroli, Simone Ruffini Ponchiroli e Associati S.r.l. Via Caprera, 6 37126 Verona / IT | Application number, filing date | 12838672.9 | 05.10.2012 | [2024/10] | WO2012US58845 | Priority number, date | US201113253838 | 05.10.2011 Original published format: US201113253838 | [2014/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013052726 | Date: | 11.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2764467 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2764467 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/32, G06T7/33, G16H50/70, G16H20/40, G16H30/20, G06T5/50 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
G06T5/50 (EP,US);
G06T7/32 (EP,US);
G06T7/33 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (EP,US);
G16H30/20 (EP,US);
G16H50/70 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10081 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10121 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20104 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/16] | G06K9/00, G06T7/00, G06T5/50 | ||
Former IPC [2014/33] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABBILDUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN CHIRURGISCHEN UND INTERVENTIONELLEN MEDIZINISCHEN VERFAHREN | [2014/33] | English: | IMAGING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR USE IN SURGICAL AND INTERVENTIONAL MEDICAL PROCEDURES | [2014/33] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMAGERIE À UTILISER DANS DES PROCÉDURES CHIRURGICALES ET DES INTERVENTIONS MÉDICALES | [2014/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 02.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2009044321 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,12,13 * abstract * * page 8 - page 14 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,15 [I] 11,14,17-19; | [XYI] - JOSKOWICZ L ET AL, "Gradient-based 2-D/3-D rigid registration of fluoroscopic X-ray to CT", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20031101), vol. 22, no. 11, doi:10.1109/TMI.2003.819288, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 1395 - 1406, XP011103095 [X] 1-3,7-10,13 * abstract * * Sections I., II. * * figure 6 * [Y] 4,15 [I] 11,14,17-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMI.2003.819288 | [XYI] - GRAEME P PENNEY ET AL, "A Comparison of Similarity Measures for Use in 2-D-3-D Medical Image Registration", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19980801), vol. 17, no. 4, ISSN 0278-0062, XP011035760 [X] 1-3,7-10,13 * abstract * * Sections II., III. * * Section IV.C * * figures 7,8 * [Y] 4,15 [I] 5,6,11,14,16-19 | [Y] - Usha Sinha ET AL, "Principal Component Analysis for Content- based Image Retrieval", RadioGraphics, Volume 22, Issue 5, doi:http://dx.doi.org/10.1148/radiographics.22.5.g02se021271, (20020901), pages 1271 - 1289, URL: http://pubs.rsna.org/doi/pdf/10.1148/radiographics.22.5.g02se021271, (20150226), XP055172364 [Y] 4,15 * abstract * * page 1273 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1148/radiographics.22.5.g02se021271 | International search | [Y]US2005047544 (FU DONGSHAN [US], et al); | [X]US2005272991 (XU CHENYANG [US], et al); | [Y]US2006002630 (FU DONGSHAN [US], et al); | [Y]US7194117 (KAUFMAN ARIE E [US], et al); | [A]US2011152676 (GROSZMANN DANIEL EDUARDO [US], et al); | [Y] - MURPHY ET AL., "The management of imaging dose during image-guided radiotherapy: Report of the AAPM Task Group 75", vol. 24, no. 10, (20070926), pages 4041 - 4063, URL: http://www.aapm.org/pubs/reports/RPT_95.pdf, (20130122), XP012103183 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.2775667 | [A] - METZ, C.T., "Digitally Reconstructed Radiographs", (20050913), URL: http://bigr.nl/files/publications/321_DRR.pdf, (20130122), XP055149106 | Examination | - GEBHARD SCHMID ET AL, "Effective Dose of CT and Fluoroscopy-Guided Perineural/Epidural Injections of the Lumbar Spine: A Comparative Study", CARDIOVASCULAR AND INTERVENTIONAL RADIOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20060201), vol. 29, no. 1, ISSN 1432-086X, pages 84 - 91, XP019365441 | - MA JIANHUA ET AL, "Low-dose computed tomography image restoration using previous normal-dose scan", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, vol. 38, no. 10, doi:10.1118/1.3638125, ISSN 0094-2405, (20111001), pages 5713 - 5731, (20110926), XP012153023 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.3638125 | - NAVAB N ET AL, "Merging visible and invisible: two Camera-Augmented Mobile C-arm (CAMC) applications", AUGMENTED REALITY, 1999. (IWAR '99). PROCEEDINGS. 2ND IEEE AND ACM INT ERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 20-21 OCT. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19991020), doi:10.1109/IWAR.1999.803814, ISBN 978-0-7695-0359-2, pages 134 - 141, XP010358753 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IWAR.1999.803814 |