Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014197156 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP75235 | 28.09.2012 | JP2011219093 | 03.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140089334 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP75235 | 28.09.2012 | JP2011219093 | 03.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2013051486 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013537491 | 28.09.2012 | JP2011219093 | 03.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103748056B | Global Dossier | 16.03.2016 | B | CN103748056 | 23.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP75235 | 28.09.2012 | JP2011219093 | 03.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2765122 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2015 | A4 | EP2765122 | 13.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP75235 | 28.09.2012 | JP2011219093 | 03.10.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013051486 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011219093 | 03.10.2011 |