EP2767090 - TRACKING A REFERENCE PICTURE BASED ON A DESIGNATED PICTURE ON AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby International AB Mr. Treublaan 7 1097 DP Amsterdam / NL | [2022/19] |
Former [2021/28] | For all designated states Dolby International AB Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | ||
Former [2016/19] | For all designated states Dolby International AB Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | ||
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISRA, Kiran c/o Sharp Laboratories of America Inc. 5750 Northwest Pacific Rim Boulevard Camas Washington 98607 / US | 02 /
DESHPANDE, Sachin G. c/o Sharp Laboratories of America Inc. 5750 Northwest Pacific Rim Boulevard Camas Washington 98607 / US | 03 /
SEGALL, Christopher A. c/o Sharp Laboratories of America Inc. 5750 Northwest Pacific Rim Boulevard Camas Washington 98607 / US | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/34] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12839718.9 | 12.10.2012 | [2021/28] | WO2012JP77021 | Priority number, date | US201113273191 | 13.10.2011 Original published format: US201113273191 | US201113287015 | 01.11.2011 Original published format: US201113287015 | US201113291961 | 08.11.2011 Original published format: US201113291961 | US201113294996 | 11.11.2011 Original published format: US201113294996 | [2014/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013054951 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2767090 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2767090 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/423, H04N19/44, H04N19/573, H04N19/58, H04N19/70 | [2015/25] | CPC: |
H04N19/58 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/423 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/44 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/573 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/34] | H04N7/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFOLGUNG EINES REFERENZBILDES AUF DER BASIS EINES BESTIMMTEN BILDES AUF EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2014/34] | English: | TRACKING A REFERENCE PICTURE BASED ON A DESIGNATED PICTURE ON AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2014/34] | French: | TRAÇAGE D'UNE IMAGE DE RÉFÉRENCE SUR LA BASE D'UNE IMAGE DÉSIGNÉE SUR UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2014/34] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 01.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16203741.0 / EP3166314 | EP20194910.4 / EP3767950 | EP22165192.0 / EP4060991 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.07.2021 | SM | 14.07.2021 | [2022/29] |
Former [2022/26] | SM | 14.07.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2727342 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); |