EP2766844 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR KERNEL ROOTKIT PROTECTION IN A HYPERVISOR ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McAfee, LLC 2821 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2017/41] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states McAfee, Inc. 2821 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANG, Amit L-1303 Jaipuria Sunrise Greens Ahinsa Khand Indirpauram Uttar Pradesh Ghaziabad 201010 / IN | 02 /
MOHINDER, Preet AG-1/67-A Vikas Puri New Dehli 110018 / IN | 03 /
SRIVASTAVA, Vivek C-155 Jalvayu Vihar Sector - 30 Haryana Gurgaon 122001 / IN | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12839735.3 | 15.09.2012 | WO2012US55670 | Priority number, date | US201113273002 | 13.10.2011 Original published format: US201113273002 | [2014/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013055499 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2766844 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/10, G06F9/455, G06F21/00 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
G06F9/45558 (EP,CN,US);
G06F9/455 (US);
G06F21/00 (US);
G06F21/53 (EP,US);
G06F21/57 (US);
G06F2009/45583 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/34] | G06F21/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR KERNEL-ROOTKIT-SCHUTZ IN EINER HYPERVISORUMGEBUNG | [2014/34] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR KERNEL ROOTKIT PROTECTION IN A HYPERVISOR ENVIRONMENT | [2014/34] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION CONTRE DES PROGRAMMES MALVEILLANTS FURTIFS DE NOYAU DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT D'HYPERVISEUR | [2014/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 27.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009055693 (BUDKO DMITRIY [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0002] ** paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059]; figure Figure 4 *; | [X] - ZHI WANG ET AL, "Countering kernel rootkits with lightweight hook protection", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 16TH ACM CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SECURITY, CCS '09, New York, New York, USA, (20090101), doi:10.1145/1653662.1653728, ISBN 978-1-60-558894-0, page 545, XP055190085 [X] 1-15 * page 546, left column, lines 3 to 15; Sections 3.1 to 3.4, Section 4.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1653662.1653728 | [X] - RYAN RILEY ET AL, Guest-Transparent Prevention of Kernel Rootkits with VMM-Based Memory Shadowing, RECENT ADVANCES IN INTRUSION DETECTION; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 1 - 20, (20080915), ISBN 978-3-540-87402-7, XP019105439 [X] 1-15 * Sections 2.1, 2.2 and 3.1 * | International search | [A]US2009007100 (FIELD SCOTT A [US], et al); | [A]US2009055693 (BUDKO DMITRIY [US], et al); | [A]US2009249053 (ZIMMER VINCENT J [US], et al); | [A]US7996836 (MCCORKENDALE BRUCE [US], et al) | by applicant | US2009055693 | - ZHI WANG ET AL., "Countering Kernel Rootkits with Lightweight Hook Protection", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 16TH ACM CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATION SECURITY, CCS '09, (20090101), doi:doi:10.1145/1653662.1653728, page 545, XP055190085 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1653662.1653728 | - "Guest-Transparent Prevention of Kernel _Rootkits with VMM-Based Memory Shadowing", RYAN RILEY ET AL., Recent Advances in Intrusion Detection, SPRINGER, (20080915), pages 1 - 20 |