EP2767622 - GELATINIZED PRE-ORIENTED FILAMENTS AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF, AND ULTRA-HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENE FIBERS AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Tongyizhong Specialty Fibre Technology & Development Co., Ltd. 901 Workshop No.16 Zhonghe Street Beijing Economic&Technological Development Area Beijing 100176 / CN | [2014/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Peng 901 Workshop No.16 Zhonghe Street Beijing Economic&Technological Development Area Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Xingliang 901 Workshop No.16 Zhonghe Street Beijing Economic&Technological Development Area Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
LIN, Fengqi 901 Workshop No.16 Zhonghe Street Beijing Economic&Technological Development Area Beijing 100176 / CN | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12839982.1 | 08.06.2012 | WO2012CN76619 | Priority number, date | CN201110306879 | 11.10.2011 Original published format: CN201110306879 | [2014/34] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013053239 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2767622 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/04, D01D1/02, D02J1/22, D01F6/46, D01D5/06, D01D5/12, D01F6/04 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
D01D5/12 (EP,IL,US);
C08F110/02 (IL,US);
D01D5/098 (IL,US);
D01D1/02 (EP,IL,US);
D01D5/04 (EP,IL,US);
D01D5/06 (EP,IL,US);
D01D5/088 (IL,US);
D01F6/04 (EP,IL,US);
D01F6/46 (EP,IL,US);
D02J1/22 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/34] | D01D5/04, D01D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Title | German: | GELATINIERTE VORORIENTIERTE FILAMENTE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE POLYETHYLENFASERN MIT ULTRAHOHEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/34] | English: | GELATINIZED PRE-ORIENTED FILAMENTS AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF, AND ULTRA-HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENE FIBERS AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF | [2014/34] | French: | FILAMENTS GÉLATINISÉS PRÉ-ORIENTÉS ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LEUR PRÉPARATION, ET FIBRES DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE À ULTRA HAUT POIDS MOLÉCULAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LEUR PRÉPARATION | [2014/34] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2014 | Translation filed | 30.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 13.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/47] | 07.06.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.06.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/47] | Divisional application(s) | EP19195980.8 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008131925 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * page 8, line 17 - page 9, line 14; example 1 * [I] 4-6; | [A]US2008290550 (DA CUNHA FERNANDA OLIVEIRA VIEIRA [BR], et al) [A] 1-13* examples 23-29; tables 5,6 *; | [I]CN101768786 (CHANGSHU SUPER FIBERS CO LTD) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] *; | [XI]CN101956238 (BEIJING TONGYIZHONG SPECIAL FIBER TECHNOLOGY DEV CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7,10,11 * the whole document * [I] 4,6,8,9,12,13 | International search | [Y]CN101122051 (HUNAN SINO THAI SPECIAL ARMING [CN]); | [A]CN101230501 (SHANDONG ICD HIGH PERFORMANCE [CN]); | [A]CN101575743 (NINGBO RONGYI CHEM FIBER SCI [CN]); | [Y]CN101680124 (HONEYWELL INT INC); | [XP]CN102433597 (BEIJING TONGYIZHONG SPECIALITY FIBER TECHNOLOGY & DEV CO LTD); | [Y] - LIANG LINLI ET AL., "Rheological study on ultrahigh-molecular weight polyethylene gel", CHINA SYNTHETIC FIBER INDUSTRY, (200504), vol. 28, no. 2, page 27, 28 AND 29, XP008173218 |