EP2744207 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING UNIT, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKAO, Masato c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Ealey, Douglas Ralph D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12840103.1 | 13.09.2012 | WO2012JP73423 | Priority number, date | JP20110225513 | 13.10.2011 Original published format: JP 2011225513 | [2014/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013054632 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2744207 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/04 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
H04N13/111 (EP,US);
G06T15/205 (US);
H04N13/128 (EP,US);
H04N2013/0081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSEINHEIT UND PROGRAMM | [2014/25] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING UNIT, AND PROGRAM | [2014/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET UNITÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES ET PROGRAMME | [2014/25] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2014 | Translation filed | 14.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 13.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6163337 (AZUMA TAKEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,13-15 * abstract * * figure 10 * * column 2, line 62 * * column 17, line 23 - line 27 * * figure 18 * * column 2, line 56 - line 60 * * column 13, line 35 - line 45 * [I] 2-12; | [A]EP2271123 (SILICONFILE TECHNOLOGIES INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011194756 (MORIFUJI TAKAFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - EBROUL IZQUIERDO M, "Stereo Matching for Enhanced Telepresence in Three-Dimensional Videocommunications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19970801), vol. 7, no. 4, ISSN 1051-8215, XP011014406 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - KARSTEN MULLER ET AL, "Reliability-based generation and view synthesis in layered depth video", MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2008 IEEE 10TH WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081008), ISBN 978-1-4244-2294-4, pages 34 - 39, XP031356597 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - SEBASTIAN KNORR ET AL, "An Image-Based Rendering (IBR) Approach for Realistic Stereo View Synthesis of TV Broadcast Based on Structure from Motion", IMAGE PROCESSING, 2007. ICIP 2007. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20070901), ISBN 978-1-4244-1436-9, pages VI - 572, XP031158390 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH1032840 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH10191396 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2008263528 (UNIV NAGOYA); | [A]JP2010063067 (FUJIFILM CORP) | by applicant | JP2006115198 | JP2006126965 |