EP2768945 - MEDIA FOR STEM CELL PROLIFERATION AND INDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minerva Biotechnologies Corporation 40 Bear Hill Rd. Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2022/01] |
Former [2014/35] | For all designated states Minerva Biotechnologies Corporation 40 Bear Hill Rd. Waltham, MA 02451 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAMDAD, Cynthia 40 Bear Hill Road Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 02 /
SMAGGHE, Benoit 40 Bear Hill Road Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/01] |
Former [2014/35] | Cowley, Catherine Mary, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12841648.4 | 17.10.2012 | [2022/01] | WO2012US60684 | Priority number, date | US201161548199P | 17.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161548199 P | US201261618578P | 30.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261618578 P | US201261622422P | 10.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261622422 P | WO2012US36975 | 08.05.2012 Original published format: PCT/US2012/036975 | US201261671588P | 13.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261671588 P | US201261671558P | 13.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261671558 P | US201261673617P | 19.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261673617 P | US201261675264P | 24.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261675264 P | US201261675292P | 24.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261675292 P | US201261677442P | 30.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261677442 P | US201261679021P | 02.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261679021 P | US201261683155P | 14.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261683155 P | US201261684654P | 17.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261684654 P | US201261693712P | 27.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261693712 P | [2014/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013059373 | Date: | 25.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2768945 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2768945 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00, C12N5/02, C12N5/0735, C12N5/074 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
C12N5/0606 (EP,US);
C12N5/0607 (US);
C12N5/0037 (EP,US);
C12N5/0056 (EP,US);
C12N2500/90 (US);
C12N2501/00 (US);
C12N2501/10 (US);
C12N2501/115 (US);
C12N2501/15 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/35] | C12N5/00, C12N5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIEN ZUR STAMMZELLENPROLIFERATION UND -INDUZIERUNG | [2014/35] | English: | MEDIA FOR STEM CELL PROLIFERATION AND INDUCTION | [2014/35] | French: | MILIEU POUR LA PROLIFÉRATION ET L'INDUCTION DE CELLULES SOUCHES | [2014/35] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 20.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.04.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.08.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 30.08.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.09.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 03.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 20.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2015 | 31.10.2021 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.10.2012 | AL | 05.01.2022 | AT | 05.01.2022 | CY | 05.01.2022 | CZ | 05.01.2022 | DK | 05.01.2022 | EE | 05.01.2022 | ES | 05.01.2022 | FI | 05.01.2022 | HR | 05.01.2022 | IT | 05.01.2022 | LT | 05.01.2022 | LV | 05.01.2022 | MC | 05.01.2022 | MK | 05.01.2022 | MT | 05.01.2022 | PL | 05.01.2022 | RO | 05.01.2022 | RS | 05.01.2022 | SI | 05.01.2022 | SK | 05.01.2022 | SM | 05.01.2022 | TR | 05.01.2022 | BG | 05.04.2022 | NO | 05.04.2022 | GR | 06.04.2022 | IS | 05.05.2022 | PT | 05.05.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 17.10.2012 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
MK | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
TR | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 17.10.2012 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
MK | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 17.10.2012 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 17.10.2012 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
NO | 05.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2008070171 (MINERVA BIOTECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [X] 15-19 * claims 1-30 * [Y] 1-14,20,21; | [X]WO2010042891 (MINERVA BIOTECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0010] , [0037] , [0038]; examples 1,11,12 *; | [XY]US2010316688 (BAMDAD CYNTHIA C [US]) [X] 14 * claims 1-10 *[Y] 1-13,15-21; | [Y] - HIKITA SHERRY T ET AL, "MUC1* mediates the growth of human pluripotent stem cells", PLOS ONE, PUBLIC LIBRARY OF SCIENCE, US, (20081003), vol. 3, no. 10, doi:10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0003312, ISSN 1932-6203, page E3312, XP002560322 [Y] 1-21 * page 10, paragraph last; figures 1,3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0003312 | International search | [X]US2010093092 (BAMDAD CYNTHIA C [US], et al); | [A]US2010278788 (BADOER CINDY [BE], et al); | [A]US2010316688 (BAMDAD CYNTHIA C [US]); | [Y]US2011014164 (HUANGFU DANWEI [US], et al); | [Y] - MEHUS ET AL., "NDK7_HUMAN", UNIPROT, (20110531), Database accession no. NDK7_HUMAN, XP003032873 | [Y] - MEHUS ET AL., "NME6: a new member of the NME23/nucleoside diphosphate kinase gene family located on human chromosome 3p21.3.", HUMAN GENETICS., (199906), vol. 104, no. 6, pages 454 - 459, XP055148861 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004390050987 | [Y] - SUMER ET AL., "The use of signalling pathway inhibitors and chromatin modifiers for enhancing pluripotency.", THERIOGENOLOGY., (20100901), vol. 74, no. 4, pages 525 - 533, XP027205544 | [Y] - FLETCHER ET AL., "Variations in Humanized and Defined Culture Conditions Supporting Derivation of New Human Embryonic Stem Cell Lines.", CLONING AND STEM CELLS., (2006), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 319 - 334, XP009165864 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/clo.2006.8.319 | Examination | - A. J. Lilly ET AL, "Nm23-H1 Indirectly Promotes the Survival of Acute Myeloid Leukemia Blast Cells by Binding to More Mature Components of the Leukemic Clone", CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20110201), vol. 71, no. 3, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-10-1704, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 1177 - 1186, XP055236075 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-10-1704 |