EP2806736 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omthera Pharmaceuticals Inc. 1800 Concord Pike Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | For all designated states Davidson, Michael H. 140 Belle Avenue Highland Park, Illinois 60035 / US | For all designated states Wisler, Gerald L. 9713 Green Island Cove Windemere, Florida 34786 / US | [2015/35] |
Former [2014/49] | For all designated states Omthera Pharmaceuticals, Inc. PO Box 7237 90 Washington Valley Road Bedminster, New Jersey 07921 / US | ||
For all designated states Davidson, Michael H. 140 Belle Avenue Highland Park, Illinois 60035 / US | |||
For all designated states Wisler, Gerald L. 9713 Green Island Cove Windemere, Florida 34786 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIDSON, Michael H. 140 Belle Avenue Highland Park, Illinois 60035 / US | 02 /
WISLER, Gerald L. 9713 Green Island Cove Windemere, Florida 34786 / US | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Eastbrook House Shaftesbury Road Cambridge CB2 8BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12841851.4 | 19.10.2012 | WO2012US61131 | Priority number, date | US201161549917P | 21.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161549917 P | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013059669 | Date: | 25.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2806736 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/00 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/202 (EP,US);
G01N33/92 (US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/232 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K9/006 (US);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
C12Q1/26 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (US);
C12Q2600/156 (US);
G01N2800/305 (US);
G01N2800/50 (US);
Y10T436/143333 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/202, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/232, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER PRÄVENTION VON AUFMERKSAMKEITSDEFIZITSTÖRUNG | [2014/49] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER | [2014/49] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT OU LA PRÉVENTION D'UN TROUBLE DE L'HYPERACTIVITÉ AVEC DÉFICIT DE L'ATTENTION | [2014/49] | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 01.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 06.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/41] | 01.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002040058 (KILIAAN AMANDA JOHANNE [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2006127620 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2008147562 (CHILDRENS S MEDICAL CT CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2009074857 (DROR GAI BEN [IL], et al) [X] 4,5 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0054] - [0064] - [0 50]; claims 1-22 * [Y] 1-3,6-15; | [Y]WO2011115476 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X] - JAN PHILIPP SCHUCHARDT ET AL, "Significance of long-chain polyunsaturated fatty acids (PUFAs) for the development and behaviour of children", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PEDIATRICS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20090812), vol. 169, no. 2, ISSN 1432-1076, pages 149 - 164, XP019781552 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 153, column right - page 158, column right; tables 1-4 * * page 159, column right - page 160, column right; figures 1-3 * * page 150, column right, paragraph second * | [Y] - BURGESS J R ET AL, "LONG-CHAIN POLYUNSATURATED FATTY ACIDS IN CHILDREN WITH ATTENTION-DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR NUTRITION, US, (20000101), vol. 71, no. 1, SUPPL, ISSN 0002-9165, pages 327S - 330S, XP008000462 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 1053 - page 1060 * | [Y] - LATTKA E ET AL, "Do FADS genotypes enhance our knowledge about fatty acid related phenotypes?", CLINICAL NUTRITION, CHURCHILL LIVINGSTONE, LONDON, GB, vol. 29, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.CLNU.2009.11.005, ISSN 0261-5614, (20100601), pages 277 - 287, (20091130), XP027069482 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 277 - page 284; figures 1,2; tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clnu.2009.11.005 | [Y] - BROOKES ET AL, "Association of Fatty Acid Desaturase Genes with Attention-Deficit/Hyperactivity Disorder", BIOLOGICAL PSYCHIATRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY; US, (20061101), vol. 60, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.BIOPSYCH.2006.04.025, ISSN 0006-3223, pages 1053 - 1061, XP005842416 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * page 1053 - page 1060; tables 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biopsych.2006.04.025 | [Y] - SYLVIE CHALON, "The role of fatty acids in the treatment of ADHD", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (20091201), vol. 57, no. 7-8, doi:10.1016/j.neuropharm.2009.08.012, ISSN 0028-3908, pages 636 - 639, XP055209764 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 327S - page 329S; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuropharm.2009.08.012 | [Y] - FOR THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF FATTY ACIDS AND LIPIDS ET AL, "alpha-Linolenic acid supplementation and conversion to n-3 long-chain polyunsaturated fatty acids in humans", PROSTAGLANDINS LEUKOTRIENES AND ESSENTIAL FATTY ACIDS, CHURCHILL LIVINGSTONE, EDINBURGH, vol. 80, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/J.PLEFA.2009.01.004, ISSN 0952-3278, (20090201), pages 85 - 91, (20090309), XP025974211 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.plefa.2009.01.004 | [Y] - Stacey Ageranioti Bélanger ET AL, "Omega-3 fatty acid treatment of children with attention-deficit hyperactivity disorder: A randomized, double-blind, placebo-controlled study", Paediatrics & child health, Canada, (20090201), pages 89 - 98, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/19436468, (20150827), XP055209919 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5855949 (MCLEAN LINSEY [US]); | [Y]WO2005086619 (MCLEAN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al); | [Y]WO2006127627 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al); | [Y]WO2007075841 (CENESTRA LLC [US], et al); | [X] - SCHUCHARDT ET AL., "Significance of long-chain polyunsaturated fatty acids (PUFAs) for the development and behaviour of children.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PEDIATRICS, (20090812), vol. 169, no. 2, pages 149 - 164, XP019781552 | [Y] - STEVENS ET AL., "Essential fatty acid metabolism in boys with attention-deficit hyperactivity disorder.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, (19950525), vol. 62, pages 761 - 768, XP003023958 | [Y] - BROOKES ET AL., "Association of Fatty Acid Desaturase Genes with Attention-Deficit/Hyperactivity Disorder.", BIOLOGICAL PSYCHIATRY, (20060413), vol. 60, pages 1053 - 1061, XP005842416 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biopsych.2006.04.025 |