EP2769795 - CUTTING TOOL FOR SCREW THREAD CUTTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Hardmetal Corp. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | [2014/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOJIMA, Chikako c/o Sumitomo Electric Hardmetal Corp. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 02 /
OKANO, Mitsuhide c/o Sumitomo Electric Hardmetal Corp. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 03 /
MURAKAMI, Reizo c/o Sumitomo Electric Hardmetal Corp. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12842323.3 | 03.10.2012 | WO2012JP75628 | Priority number, date | JP20110229447 | 19.10.2011 Original published format: JP 2011229447 | [2014/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013058110 | Date: | 25.04.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2769795 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B23G5/00, B23B27/02 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
B23G5/02 (EP,US);
B23B27/02 (EP,US);
B23G5/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEWERKZEUG ZUR SCHNEIDUNG VON SCHRAUBGEWINDEN | [2014/35] | English: | CUTTING TOOL FOR SCREW THREAD CUTTING | [2014/35] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE POUR LE FILETAGE | [2014/35] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2014 | Translation filed | 17.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 19.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE466346 (HERMANN STEINRUECK) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,3,5,7,9,11,13,14; claims 1-8 *; | [A]DE510969 (EMIL BAUMANN) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [X]JPH0265919 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [X]JPH11320255 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS5521873U (YOSHIO KIDA); | [Y]JPH11320255 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) | by applicant | JPH0790421B |