EP2769727 - DEOXYNUCLEOSIDE/NUCLEOSIDE COMBINATION FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF TUMORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/35] | USE FOR DEOXYNUCLEOSIDE/NUCLEOSIDE COMBINATION IN PREPARATION OF TUMOR MEDICAMENT | ||
[2016/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhang, Shizhuang No. 2428 Yuhe Road Kuiwen District Weifang, Shandong 261031 / CN | [2014/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Shizhuang No.2428 Yuhe Road Weifang Shandong 261031 / CN | 02 /
CHENG, Xin No.7166 Baotong West Street Weifang Shandong 261053 / CN | 03 /
GAO, Zhiqin No.7166 Baotong West Street Weifang Shandong 261053 / CN | 04 /
HAN, Ming No.7166 Baotong West Street Weifang Shandong 261053 / CN | [2016/18] |
Former [2014/35] | 01 /
CHENG, Xin No.7166 Baotong West Street Weifang Shandong 261053 / CN | ||
02 /
GAO, Zhiqin No.7166 Baotong West Street Weifang Shandong 261053 / CN | |||
03 /
HAN, Ming No.7166 Baotong West Street Weifang Shandong 261053 / CN | Representative(s) | Sun, Yiming HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 33 80801 München / DE | [2014/35] | Application number, filing date | 12842329.0 | 16.10.2012 | [2016/20] | WO2012CN01392 | Priority number, date | CN201110314309 | 17.10.2011 Original published format: CN201110314309 | [2014/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013056510 | Date: | 25.04.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2769727 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2769727 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/708, A61K31/7076, A61K31/7072, A61K31/7068, A61P35/00, A61P35/02 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
A61K31/708 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,US);
A61K31/7072 (EP,US);
A61K31/7076 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/7068, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/7072, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7076, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/708, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DESOXYNUKLEOSID-/NUKLEOSID-KOMBINATION ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON TUMOREN | [2016/08] | English: | DEOXYNUCLEOSIDE/NUCLEOSIDE COMBINATION FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF TUMORS | [2016/08] | French: | COMBINAISON DÉSOXYNUCLÉOSIDE/NUCLÉOSIDE POUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE TUMEURS | [2016/08] |
Former [2014/35] | VERWENDUNG ZUR DESOXYNUKLEOSID-/NUKLEOSID-KOMBINATION BEI DER HERSTELLUNG VON TUMORARZNEIMITTELN | ||
Former [2014/35] | USE FOR DEOXYNUCLEOSIDE/NUCLEOSIDE COMBINATION IN PREPARATION OF TUMOR MEDICAMENT | ||
Former [2014/35] | UTILISATION D'UNE COMBINAISON DÉSOXYNUCLÉOSIDE/NUCLÉOSIDE DANS LA PRÉPARATION D'UN MÉDICAMENT ANTITUMORAL | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2014 | Translation filed | 13.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 23.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.04.2016 | Observations by third parties | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.05.2016 | AT | 18.05.2016 | BG | 18.05.2016 | CY | 18.05.2016 | CZ | 18.05.2016 | EE | 18.05.2016 | FI | 18.05.2016 | HR | 18.05.2016 | IS | 18.05.2016 | LT | 18.05.2016 | LV | 18.05.2016 | MC | 18.05.2016 | MK | 18.05.2016 | RS | 18.05.2016 | SI | 18.05.2016 | SK | 18.05.2016 | SM | 18.05.2016 | NO | 18.08.2016 | GR | 19.08.2016 | PT | 19.09.2016 | LU | 16.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
LU | 16.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
LU | 16.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
LU | 16.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 18.05.2016 | |
NO | 18.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1270049 (SYLVEN BENGT [SE]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * claim 2 * * column 1, lines 9-14 * * examples 4-6 *; | [X]US2001044421 (VON BORSTEL REID W [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * claims 150-153 * * examples 2, 7 *; | [X]CN102172359 (SHIZHUANG ZHANG) [X] 1-5,7,8 * claims 1-10 *; | [A] - KIM K T ET AL, "The effect of pyrimidine nucleosides on adenosine-induced apoptosis in HL-60 cells", JOURNAL OF CANCER RESEARCH AND CLINICAL ONCOLOGY 1998 DE, (1998), vol. 124, no. 9, ISSN 0171-5216, pages 471 - 477, XP002728120 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 2, 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004320050201 | [A] - LOWE J K ET AL, "Inhibition of growth rate and deoxynucleoside triphosphate concentrations in cultured leukemia L1210 cells", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (1976), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 0026-895X, pages 177 - 184, XP009179465 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 179, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 180, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 182, column 2, paragraph 2 * | [A] - COHEN J D ET AL, "Deoxyribonucleoside triphosphate pools and thymidine chemosensitization in human T-cell leukemia", LEUKEMIA RESEARCH, NEW YORK,NY, US, vol. 17, no. 2, ISSN 0145-2126, (199302), pages 167 - 174, (19930201), XP026353256 [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - FRIED J ET AL, "Cytotoxic and cytokinetic effects of thymidine, 5-fluorouracil, and deoxycytidine on HeLa cells in culture", CANCER RESEARCH, (1981), vol. 41, no. 7, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 2627 - 2632, XP002728121 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2629, column 2, paragraph 3 * | [A] - ROSS D D ET AL, "Effects of deoxynucleosides on cultured human leukemia cell growth and deoxynucleotide pools.", CANCER RESEARCH NOV 1981, (198111), vol. 41, no. 11 Pt 1, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 4493 - 4498, XP002728122 [A] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/http://cancerres.aacrjournals.org/content/41/11_Part_1/4493 | [A] - ZHEN Y S ET AL, "Effects of acivicin and dipyridamole on hepatoma 3924A cells.", CANCER RESEARCH APR 1983, (198304), vol. 43, no. 4, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 1616 - 1619, XP055132458 [A] 1-8 * abstract * | International search | [Y]WO9902143 (CAN FITE TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL], et al); | [A]US2002198183 (ROBINS H IAN [US]); | [X]CN102172359 (SHIZHUANG ZHANG); | [XP]CN102499937 (SHIZHUANG ZHANG) | other | - CHENG XIN; QU LINTAO; ZHANG SHIZHUANG; WANG BIN; PAN XIAOJIE, "Construction of mice colon cancer transplantation tumor model and multiple mice MRI studies", Chinese Journal of Medical Imaging Technology, (20080000), vol. 24, no. 9, pages 1345 - 1347 | - CHENG XIN; DAI SHENG; ZHANG SHIZHUANG; WANG BIN; YANG KUIHUA, "MRI evaluation of the curative effect of gecko's active ingredients on rabbit VX2 liver transplantation tumor", Chinese Journal of Medical Imaging Technology, (20100000), vol. 26, no. 5, pages 812 - 814 | - CHENG XIN; ZHANG SHIZHUANG; WANG BIN; DONG PENG, "Expression and clinical significance of CD44v6, MMP_9 and VEGF in gastric cancer tissue", Proceedings of Weifang Medical College, (20080000), vol. 30, no. 4, pages 319 - 321 | - CHENG XIN; HAN MING; ZHANG SHIZHUANG; WANG BIN; QU LINTAO, "Expression and clinical significance of CD44v6 and MMP-9 in gastric cancer", Progress in Modern Biomedicine, (20080000), vol. 8, no. 11, pages 2051 - 2053 | - DAI SHENG; CHENG XIN; WANG BIN; ZHANG YUEMEI; DONG PENG; ZHANG SHIZHUANG, "The relationship of spiral CT signs of gastric carcinoma with CD44v6 and MMP-9", Proceedings of Weifang Medical College, (20080000), vol. 30, no. 5, pages 422 - 424 | - CHENG XIN; QU LINTAO; ZHANG SHIZHUANG; WANG BIN; PAN XIAOJIE, "Experimental studies of multiple mice MRI to observe the curative effect of mice colon cancer transplanted tumor endothelial inhibition", Journal of Clinical Radiology, (20080000), vol. 27, no. 10, pages 1419 - 1422 | - CHENG XIN; QU LINTAO; ZHANG SHIZHUANG; WANG BIN; MENG FANLIAN, "Experimental studies of multiple mice MRI to evaluate the curative effect of mice colon cancer endothelial inhibition", Journal of Practical Radiology, (20080000), vol. 24, no. 8, pages 1125 - 1128 | - HAN MING; CHENG XIN; ZHANG SHIZHUANG; WANG BIN; QU LINTAO, "Application value of ADC value in the therapeutic evaluation of endothelial inhibition for mice colon cancer", Chinese Journal of Medical Imaging Technology, (20090000), vol. 25, no. 6, pages 963 - 965 | - HAN MING; CHENG XIN; ZHANG SHIZHUANG, "Studies of diffusion weighted imaging endothelial inhibition for the efficacy of mice colon cancer and its correlation with tumor cell density", Journal of Practical Radiology, (20090000), vol. 25, no. 8, pages 1191 - 1194 |