Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9924793 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2018 | B2 | US2017095072 | 06.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213642651 | 30.07.2012 | WO2012US48775 | 30.07.2012 | US201514714682 | 18.05.2015 | US201414183052 | 18.02.2014 | US201314013285 | 29.08.2013 | US201261651101 | 24.05.2012 | US201615378736 | 14.12.2016 | US201615014730 | 03.02.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9554644 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2017 | B2 | US2016150876 | 02.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213642651 | 30.07.2012 | WO2012US48775 | 30.07.2012 | US201514714682 | 18.05.2015 | US201414183052 | 18.02.2014 | US201314013285 | 29.08.2013 | US201261651101 | 24.05.2012 | US201615014730 | 03.02.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9277809 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2016 | B2 | US2015250303 | 10.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213642651 | 30.07.2012 | WO2012US48775 | 30.07.2012 | US201514714682 | 18.05.2015 | US201414183052 | 18.02.2014 | US201314013285 | 29.08.2013 | US201261651101 | 24.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9055810 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2015 | B2 | US2014158026 | 12.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213642651 | 30.07.2012 | WO2012US48775 | 30.07.2012 | US201414183052 | 18.02.2014 | US201314013285 | 29.08.2013 | US201261651101 | 24.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9113703 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2015 | B2 | US2013340655 | 26.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213642651 | 30.07.2012 | WO2012US48775 | 30.07.2012 | US201314013285 | 29.08.2013 | US201261651101 | 24.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8671853 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2014 | B2 | US2013139736 | 06.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213642651 | 30.07.2012 | WO2012US48775 | 30.07.2012 | US201261651101 | 24.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10413053 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2019 | B2 | US2018132607 | 17.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213642651 | 30.07.2012 | WO2012US48775 | 30.07.2012 | US201514714682 | 18.05.2015 | US201414183052 | 18.02.2014 | US201314013285 | 29.08.2013 | US201261651101 | 24.05.2012 | US201615378736 | 14.12.2016 | US201615014730 | 03.02.2016 | US201815869684 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140098842 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48775 | 30.07.2012 | US201261651101 | 24.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3198070U | Global Dossier | 18.06.2015 | U | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48775 | 30.07.2012 | US201261651101 | 24.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3360440 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414183052 | 18.02.2014 | US201314013285 | 29.08.2013 | EP14182537 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2842458 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2018 | B1 | EP2842458 | 04.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414183052 | 18.02.2014 | US201314013285 | 29.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105124923B | Global Dossier | 01.06.2018 | B | CN105124923 | 09.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414183052 | 18.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3110698 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2024 | C | CA3110698 | 28.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414183052 | 18.02.2014 | CA2860970 | 27.08.2014 | US201314013285 | 29.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2860970 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2022 | C | CA2860970 | 28.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414183052 | 18.02.2014 | US201314013285 | 29.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2814945 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2019 | C | CA2814945 | 24.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48775 | 30.07.2012 | US201261651101 | 24.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020200160B | Global Dossier | 09.09.2021 | B2 | AU2020200160 | 30.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2014216002 | 22.08.2014 | AU2020200160 | 09.01.2020 | AU2012381034 | 30.07.2012 | US201414183052 | 18.02.2014 | US201314013285 | 29.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014216002B | Global Dossier | 10.10.2019 | B2 | AU2014216002 | 19.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2014216002 | 22.08.2014 | AU2012381034 | 30.07.2012 | US201414183052 | 18.02.2014 | US201314013285 | 29.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012381034C | Global Dossier | 18.01.2018 | C1 | AU2012381034B | 07.09.2017 | B2 | AU2012381034 | 11.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48775 | 30.07.2012 | US201261651101 | 24.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2685867 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2023 | B1 | EP2685867 | 13.01.2016 | A4 | EP2685867 | 22.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48775 | 30.07.2012 | US201261651101 | 24.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2698967T | 06.02.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201414183052 | 18.02.2014 | US201314013285 | 29.08.2013 | US201261651101 | 24.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1207805 | 12.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414183052 | 18.02.2014 | US201314013285 | 29.08.2013 | US201261651101 | 24.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1257450 | 18.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414183052 | 18.02.2014 | US201314013285 | 29.08.2013 | US201261651101 | 24.05.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013176690 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261651101 | 24.05.2012 |