EP2771721 - MULTIPLE-CORE COMPUTER PROCESSOR FOR REVERSE TIME MIGRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | ||
For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80636 Munich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHALF, John 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | 02 /
DONOFRIO, David 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | 03 /
OLIKER, leonid 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | 04 /
KRUEGER, Jens Parkstr. 73 Kaiserslautern 67655 / US | 05 /
WILLIAMS, Samuel 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2014/40] |
Former [2014/36] | 01 /
SHALF, John 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | ||
02 /
DONOFRIO, David 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | |||
03 /
OLIKER, leonid 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | |||
04 /
KRUEGER, Jens Robstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / US | |||
05 /
WILLIAMS, Samuel 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | Manley, Nicholas Michael WP Thompson Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 12843129.3 | 26.10.2012 | WO2012US62248 | Priority number, date | US201161553007P | 28.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161553007 P | [2014/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013063486 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2771721 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/00 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
G06F15/7825 (EP,US);
G06F12/0842 (US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Title | German: | MULTIKERN-COMPUTERPROZESSOR FÜR REVERSE-TIME-MIGRATION | [2014/36] | English: | MULTIPLE-CORE COMPUTER PROCESSOR FOR REVERSE TIME MIGRATION | [2014/36] | French: | PROCESSEUR INFORMATIQUE MULTIC UR POUR MIGRATION INVERSE EN TEMPS | [2014/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 21.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/09] | 26.01.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.03.2021 | 31.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - XIAOWEN CHEN ET AL, "Supporting distributed shared memory on multi-core network-on-chips using a dual microcoded controller", DESIGN, AUTOMATION, AND TEST IN EUROPE CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION. PROCEEDINGS, US, (20100308), ISSN 1530-1591, ISBN 978-0-7695-2288-3, pages 39 - 44, XP055344414 [I] 1-15 * figure 7a * * figure 7b * * figure 7c * * page 7 * * page 8 * * page 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DATE.2010.5457240 | [A] - Rudy Lauwereins, "Multi-core platforms are a reality... but where is the software support? Content", (20060823), URL: http://www.mpsoc-forum.org/previous/2006/slides/Lauwereins.pdf, (20170210), XP055344439 [A] 12,13 * page 7 * * page 20 * | International search | [Y]US2002019928 (SAULSBURY ASHLEY [US]); | [A]US2006248287 (BUYUKTOSUNOGLU ALPER [US], et al); | [Y]US2009182944 (COMPARAN MIGUEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2010088035 (ETGEN JOHN T [US], et al); | [A]US2010228922 (LIMAYE DEEPAK [US]); | [Y]US2011219208 (ASAAD SAMEH [US], et al) |