EP2771087 - A METHOD FOR EXTRACORPOREAL ELIMINATION OF ONE OR MORE COMPONENTS FROM BLOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glycorex Transplantation AB Sölvegatan 41 223 70 Lund / SE | [2014/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NILSSON, Kurt Andjaktsvägen 6 S-226 53 Lund / SE | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | Henriksson, Dan Ragnar Mikael Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 12843200.2 | 29.10.2012 | WO2012SE51173 | Priority number, date | SE20110000803 | 28.10.2011 Original published format: SE 1100803 | [2014/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013062479 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2771087 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/08, G01N33/80, A61M1/30, B01J20/32, B01D15/38 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
B01D15/3804 (EP,US);
B01D15/3809 (EP,US);
B01D15/3828 (EP,US);
B01J20/3255 (EP,US);
B01J20/3274 (EP,US);
A61M1/3679 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/36] | B01D15/08, G01N33/80, A61M1/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR EXTRAKORPORALEN AUSSCHEIDUNG VON EINEM ODER MEHREREN BESTANDTEILEN AUS BLUT | [2014/36] | English: | A METHOD FOR EXTRACORPOREAL ELIMINATION OF ONE OR MORE COMPONENTS FROM BLOOD | [2014/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR L'ÉLIMINATION EXTRACORPORELLE D'UN OU DE PLUSIEURS CONSTITUANTS À PARTIR DU SANG | [2014/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 11.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/35] | 28.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2018 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability | 21.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 21.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.06.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2016 | 31.10.2017 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   17.04.2018 | 31.10.2018 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   05.03.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0158510 (GLYCOREX TRANSPLANTATION AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US6686457 (NILSSON KURT [SE]) [X] 1-20* the whole document *; | [X]WO2011046504 (GLYCOREX AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 8 * * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 11 * * figure 1 * | International search | [X]WO0001730 (A & SCIENCE INVEST AB [SE], et al); | [X]US6444655 (NILSSON KURT [SE]); | [X]US2002146814 (NILSSON KURT G I [SE]); | [A]US2007224652 (HOLGERSSON JAN [SE], et al); | [X]WO2010037785 (UNIV GENT [BE], et al); | [X] - RYDBERG L. ET AL., "In vitro assessment of a new ABO immunosorbent with synthetic carbohydrates attached to sepharose", TRANSPL INT, (2005), vol. 17, pages 666 - 672, XP019323995 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00147-004-0775-7 | [A] - GENBERG H. ET AL., "The efficacy of antigen-specific immunoadsorption and rebound of anti-A/B antibodies in ABO-incompatible kidney transplantation", NEPHROLOGY DIALYSIS TRANSPLANTATION, (2011), vol. 26, pages 2394 - 2400, XP055066349 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ndt/gfr237 | [A] - CODDENS A. ET AL., "Recognition of blood group ABH type 1 determinants by the FedF adhesin of F18-fimbriated Eschrichia coli", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 284, no. 15, pages 9713 - 9726, XP008119049 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M807866200 |