EP2772989 - COMPACT CONNECTION SYSTEM FOR MAINS SWITCHGEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smilics Technologies S.L. Lepanto 49 08223 Terrassa (Barcelona) / ES | [2017/30] |
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states Smilics Technologies S.l. Lepanto 49 08223 Terrassa (Barcelona) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PONS GONZALEZ, Carles c/o Smilics Technologies, S.L. Lepanto 49 08223 Terrassa (Barcelona) / ES | [2017/30] |
Former [2014/36] | 01 /
PONS GONZALEZ, Carles c/o Smilics Technologies, S-L. Lepanto 49 E-08223 Terrassa (Barcelona) / ES | Representative(s) | Ponti & Partners, S.L.P Edifici PRISMA Av. Diagonal núm. 611-613, Planta 2 08028 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Oficina Ponti, SLP C. de Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2014/36] | Morgades y Manonelles, Juan Antonio C/ Rector Ubach, 37-39, bj. 2a 08021 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 12843653.2 | 17.10.2012 | [2017/30] | WO2012ES70715 | Priority number, date | ES201131742P | 28.10.2011 Original published format: ES 201131742 P | [2014/36] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013060912 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | ES | [2013/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2772989 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2772989 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 02.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01R11/30, H01R13/635 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
G01R15/14 (EP,US);
H01R13/6205 (US);
H01R11/30 (ES);
G01R1/0416 (EP,US);
H01H2071/042 (EP,US);
H01H2071/044 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Extension states | BA | 01.04.2014 | ME | 01.04.2014 | Title | German: | KOMPAKTES VERBINDUNGSSYSTEM FÜR SCHALTANLAGE DES STROMNETZES | [2017/08] | English: | COMPACT CONNECTION SYSTEM FOR MAINS SWITCHGEAR | [2014/36] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONNEXION COMPACT POUR APPAREILLAGE DE RÉSEAU ÉLECTRIQUE | [2014/36] |
Former [2014/36] | KOMPAKTES VERBINDUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN NETZSCHALTGETRIEBE | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2014 | Translation filed | 01.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 31.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.10.2012 | AL | 26.07.2017 | AT | 26.07.2017 | CY | 26.07.2017 | CZ | 26.07.2017 | EE | 26.07.2017 | ES | 26.07.2017 | FI | 26.07.2017 | HR | 26.07.2017 | LT | 26.07.2017 | LV | 26.07.2017 | MC | 26.07.2017 | MK | 26.07.2017 | RO | 26.07.2017 | RS | 26.07.2017 | SI | 26.07.2017 | SK | 26.07.2017 | SM | 26.07.2017 | TR | 26.07.2017 | LU | 17.10.2017 | MT | 17.10.2017 | BG | 26.10.2017 | GR | 27.10.2017 | IS | 26.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.10.2012 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MK | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
MT | 17.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 17.10.2012 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MK | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
MT | 17.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 17.10.2012 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
MT | 17.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.10.2012 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
MT | 17.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
MT | 17.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 26.07.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0053690 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,13,22,24,25 * page 1, lines 8-37; figures 1-3; claims 1-7 * * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 22 * [I] 3,14; | [Y]US6030229 (TSUTSUI YASUMITSU [JP]) [Y] 9 * column 5, line 63 - column 9, line 39; claims 1-12 *; | [A]JP2002298726 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-25* abstract *; | [Y]GB2387721 (MAGTRIX CONNECTORS LTD [GB]) [Y] 20-23 * page 12, paragraph 4 - page 16, paragraph l; claims 1-29 *; | [XYI]US2005255718 (MCLEISH GRAHAM J [GB]) [X] 1,2,6,8,10-12,19,24,25 * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [0101] - [0137]; claims 1-41 * [Y] 3-5,7,9,20-23 [I] 13-18; | [Y]US2005280429 (MAXWELL WILLIAM W [US]) [Y] 3-5,7 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0010] - [0027]; claims 1-15 *; | [XI]EP1865581 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [X] 1,2,6,13,22,24,25 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0019] - [0038]; figures 4-8; claims 1-14 * [I] 3,14 | International search | [Y]US6030229 (TSUTSUI YASUMITSU [JP]); | [Y]GB2387721 (MAGTRIX CONNECTORS LTD [GB]); | [A]US2004092135 (HOFMEISTER RUDOLF J [US], et al); | [X]US2005255718 (MCLEISH GRAHAM J [GB]); | [Y]US2005280429 (MAXWELL WILLIAM W [US]) |