EP2730914 - PREPREG PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINAMIDA, Daiki Ehime Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1515, Oaza-tsutsui Masaki-cho, Iyo-gun, Ehime 7913193 / JP | 02 /
KAWASE, Koichi Ehime Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1515, Oaza-tsutsui Masaki-cho, Iyo-gun, Ehime 7913193 / JP | 03 /
KURAMATA, Osamu Shiga Plant, Toray indsutries, Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga, 5208558 / JP | 04 /
MORI, Takashi Ehime Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1515, Oaza-tsutsui Masaki-cho, Iyo-gun, Ehime 7913193 / JP | 05 /
OE, Keita Ehime Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1515, Oaza-tsutsui Masaki-cho, Iyo-gun, Ehime 7913193 / JP | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2016/28] |
Former [2014/20] | Hoefer & Partner Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12843661.5 | 28.08.2012 | [2016/28] | WO2012JP71664 | Priority number, date | JP20110236952 | 28.10.2011 Original published format: JP 2011236952 | [2014/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013061682 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2730914 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2730914 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/892, B29C70/54, B29C70/50, G01N21/84, G01N21/89, G01N21/94, G01N21/898, B23B41/00, B32B41/00, B32B7/06, B32B29/02, C08J5/24, G01N21/88 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
B29C70/54 (EP,KR,US);
B29C70/506 (EP,KR,US);
B32B29/02 (EP,KR,US);
B32B41/00 (KR,US);
B32B7/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/243 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/8422 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/88 (EP,US);
G01N21/8806 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/89 (EP,US);
G01N21/8914 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/892 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/8921 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/898 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/94 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2041/04 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2250/40 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2255/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/106 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2305/076 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2305/08 (KR,US);
B32B2305/22 (KR,US);
B32B2307/738 (KR,US);
B32B2307/748 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2313/04 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2363/00 (KR,US);
B32B2377/00 (KR,US);
G01N2021/8472 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2021/8841 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2021/8854 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2021/8861 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2021/8874 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/18] | G01N21/892, B29C70/54, B29C70/50, G01N21/84, G01N21/89, G01N21/94, G01N21/898, B23B41/00 | ||
Former IPC [2014/20] | G01N21/892 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PREPREG | [2014/20] | English: | PREPREG PRODUCTION METHOD | [2014/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PRÉIMPRÉGNÉ | [2014/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2014 | Translation filed | 07.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 13.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2012 | AL | 13.07.2016 | AT | 13.07.2016 | BE | 13.07.2016 | CY | 13.07.2016 | CZ | 13.07.2016 | DK | 13.07.2016 | EE | 13.07.2016 | ES | 13.07.2016 | FI | 13.07.2016 | HR | 13.07.2016 | LT | 13.07.2016 | LV | 13.07.2016 | MC | 13.07.2016 | MK | 13.07.2016 | NL | 13.07.2016 | PL | 13.07.2016 | RO | 13.07.2016 | RS | 13.07.2016 | SE | 13.07.2016 | SI | 13.07.2016 | SK | 13.07.2016 | SM | 13.07.2016 | TR | 13.07.2016 | IE | 28.08.2016 | LU | 28.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | BG | 13.10.2016 | GB | 13.10.2016 | NO | 13.10.2016 | GR | 14.10.2016 | IS | 13.11.2016 | PT | 14.11.2016 | DE | 01.03.2017 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 28.08.2012 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
TR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 28.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
DE | 01.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.08.2012 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 28.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
DE | 01.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.08.2012 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 28.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
DE | 01.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 28.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
DE | 01.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 28.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
DE | 01.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 28.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 31.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JPH09150416 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [YD] 1-15 * abstract *; | [AD]JPH09225939 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [AD] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP2226624 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** column 3 *; | [Y]US2011135872 (MAY ANDRZEJ MICHAL [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0030] * | International search | [A]JPH06228340 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH0850105 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH09150416 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH09225939 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2000017546 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS, et al); | [A]JP2008196059 (DAIO SEISHI KK) | by applicant | JPH09136323 | JPH09150416 | JPH09225939 | JP2010085166 | JP2011085468 |