EP2773112 - IMAGE ENCODING METHOD, IMAGE DECODING METHOD, IMAGE ENCODING APPARATUS, AND IMAGE DECODING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/36] | IMAGE ENCODING METHOD, IMAGE DECODING METHOD, IMAGE ENCODING DEVICE, AND IMAGE DECODING DEVICE | ||
[2017/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor New York, NY 10017 / US | [2018/32] |
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor New York NY 10017 / US | ||
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAHADANIAH, Viktor c/o Panasonic Singapore Laboratory BLK 1022 Tai Seng Avenue, 06-3530 Tai Seng Industrial Estate 534415 Singapore / SG | 02 /
LIM, Chong Soon c/o Panasonic Singapore Laboratory BLK 1022 Tai Seng Avenue, 06-3530 Tai Seng Industrial Estate 534415 Singapore / SG | 03 /
NAING, Sue Mon Thet c/o Panasonic Singapore Laboratory BLK 1022 Tai Seng Avenue, 06-3530 Tai Seng Industrial Estate 314415 Singapore / SG | 04 /
SUN, Hai wei c/o Panasonic Singapore Laboratory BLK 1022 Tai Seng Avenue, 06-3530 Tai Seng Industrial Estate 314415 Singapore / SG | 05 /
SUGIO, Toshiyasu c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
NISHI, Takahiro c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 07 /
SASAI, Hisao c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 08 /
SHIBAHARA, Youji c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 09 /
TANIKAWA, Kyoko c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 10 /
MATSUNOBU, Toru c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 11 /
TERADA, Kengo c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/32] |
Former [2014/36] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12843874.4 | 18.10.2012 | [2018/32] | WO2012JP06684 | Priority number, date | US201161552147P | 27.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161552147 P | [2014/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013061551 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2773112 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2773112 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/176, H04N19/52, H04N19/51, H04N19/513 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
H04N19/52 (EP,CN,RU,US);
H04N19/176 (RU,US);
H04N19/51 (KR,RU,US);
H04N19/513 (EP,RU,US);
H04N19/58 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2015/16] | H04N19/52, H04N19/58, H04N19/51, H04N19/513 | ||
Former IPC [2014/36] | H04N7/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDVERSCHLÜSSELUNGSVERFAHREN, BILDENTSCHLÜSSELUNGSVERFAHREN, BILDVERSCHLÜSSELUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BILDENTSCHLÜSSELUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/36] | English: | IMAGE ENCODING METHOD, IMAGE DECODING METHOD, IMAGE ENCODING APPARATUS, AND IMAGE DECODING APPARATUS | [2017/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE, DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE D'IMAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE | [2014/36] |
Former [2014/36] | IMAGE ENCODING METHOD, IMAGE DECODING METHOD, IMAGE ENCODING DEVICE, AND IMAGE DECODING DEVICE | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2013 | Translation filed | 09.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 23.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2012 | AL | 08.08.2018 | AT | 08.08.2018 | CY | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | HR | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | MK | 08.08.2018 | PT | 08.08.2018 | RO | 08.08.2018 | RS | 08.08.2018 | SE | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | SM | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | IE | 18.10.2018 | LU | 18.10.2018 | MT | 18.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | NO | 08.11.2018 | GR | 09.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 18.10.2012 | |
AL | 08.08.2018 | ||
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 18.10.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
MT | 18.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 18.10.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
MT | 18.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 18.10.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
MT | 18.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 18.10.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
MT | 18.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 18.10.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - J-L LIN ET AL, "Improved Advanced Motion Vector Prediction", 4. JCT-VC MEETING; 95. MPEG MEETING; 20-1-2011 - 28-1-2011; DAEGU;(JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110115), no. JCTVC-D125, ISSN 0000-0015, XP030008165 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * sections 1 and 2 * * figures 1-4 * | [A] - JOONYOUNG PARK ET AL, "Improvements on median motion vectors of AMVP", 4. JCT-VC MEETING; 95. MPEG MEETING; 20-1-2011 - 28-1-2011; DAEGU;(JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110114), no. JCTVC-D095, ISSN 0000-0015, XP030008135 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * sections 1-2 * * figure 2 * | [A] - LAROCHE G ET AL, "RD Optimized Coding for Motion Vector Predictor Selection", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080901), vol. 18, no. 9, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2008.928882, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 1247 - 1257, XP011231739 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * sections II.B, III.A and III.C * * figures 1,2, 4, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2008.928882 | [A] - TOURAPIS A M ET AL, "Motion Vector Prediction With Reference Frame Consideration", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, S P I E - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, US, (20030101), vol. 5203, doi:10.1117/12.507858, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 440 - 447, XP002550052 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * section 2 * * figures 2-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.507858 | [XP] - LIM C S ET AL, "MVP scaling issue for LTRPs", 9. JCT-VC MEETING; 100. MPEG MEETING; 27-4-2012 - 7-5-2012; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120417), no. JCTVC-I0422, XP030112185 [XP] 1-20 * abstract * * sections 1-3 * | [AP] - TAKAHASHI Y ET AL, "High-level Syntax: Motion vector prediction issue for long-term reference picture", 10. JCT-VC MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 11-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120629), no. JCTVC-J0071, XP030112433 [AP] 1-20 * abstract * * section 1-3 * * figure 1 * | [AP] - CHEN Y ET AL, "AHG10: Motion related hooks for HEVC multiview/3DV extension based on long-term reference pictures", 10. JCT-VC MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 11-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120703), no. JCTVC-J0121, XP030112483 [AP] 1-20 * abstract * * section 2 * | International search | [A]JP2003333602 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); | [A] - JOEL JUNG ET AL., "Competition- Based Scheme for Motion Vector Selection and Coding", ITU-TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDIZATION SECTOR STUDY GROUP 16 QUESTION 6 VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP (VCEG) 29TH MEETING: KLAGENFURT, AUSTRIA; DOCUMENT VCEG-AC06, ITU-T, (200607), XP030003490 | [A] - RICKARD SJOBERG ET AL., "Absolute signaling of reference pictures", JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING (JCT-VC) OF ITU-T SG16 WP3 AND ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 6TH MEETING: TORINO; JCTVC-F493, ITU- T, (201107), XP003031157 | Examination | - JOCH, "Comments on JVT-E022d7", 5. JVT MEETING; 14-10-2002 - 18-10-2002; GENEVA, CH; (JOINT VIDEO TEAMOF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ), (20021018), no. JVT-E135r1, ISSN 0000-0430, XP030005550 | - WIEGAND, "Editor's Proposed Draft Text Modifications for Joint Video Specification (ITU-T Rec. H.264 | ISO/IEC 14496-10 AVC), Draft 7", 5. JVT MEETING; 14-10-2002 - 18-10-2002; GENEVA, CH; (JOINT VIDEO TEAMOF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20021018), no. JVT-E022d7, ISSN 0000-0438, XP030005439 | - YIN, "Unification of Motion Vector Prediction Methods", 5. JVT MEETING; 14-10-2002 - 18-10-2002; GENEVA, CH; (JOINT VIDEO TEAMOF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20021018), no. JVT-E061r1, ISSN 0000-0432, XP030005478 |