Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022271681 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117353360 | 21.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016191280 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562165461 | 22.05.2015 | US201562175666 | 15.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021364899 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562165461 | 22.05.2015 | US201414267500 | 01.05.2014 | US201161554676 | 02.11.2011 | US201715438290 | 21.02.2017 | US201916518420 | 22.07.2019 | US201562175666 | 15.06.2015 | WO2012US63298 | 02.11.2012 | US201815924819 | 19.03.2018 | US201615160675 | 20.05.2016 | US202117353360 | 21.06.2021 | US201261587439 | 17.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9921459 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2018 | B2 | US2017159875 | 08.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562165461 | 22.05.2015 | US201414267500 | 01.05.2014 | US201161554676 | 02.11.2011 | US201715438290 | 21.02.2017 | US201562175666 | 15.06.2015 | WO2012US63298 | 02.11.2012 | US201615160675 | 20.05.2016 | US201261587439 | 17.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9575330 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2017 | B2 | US2016334638 | 17.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562165461 | 22.05.2015 | US201414267500 | 01.05.2014 | US201161554676 | 02.11.2011 | US201562175666 | 15.06.2015 | WO2012US63298 | 02.11.2012 | US201615160675 | 20.05.2016 | US201261587439 | 17.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9360740 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2016 | B2 | US2014288694 | 25.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414267500 | 01.05.2014 | US201161554676 | 02.11.2011 | WO2012US63298 | 02.11.2012 | US201261587439 | 17.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11042078 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2021 | B2 | US2019339597 | 07.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562165461 | 22.05.2015 | US201414267500 | 01.05.2014 | US201161554676 | 02.11.2011 | US201715438290 | 21.02.2017 | US201916518420 | 22.07.2019 | US201562175666 | 15.06.2015 | WO2012US63298 | 02.11.2012 | US201815924819 | 19.03.2018 | US201615160675 | 20.05.2016 | US201261587439 | 17.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10359690 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2019 | B2 | US2018275492 | 27.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562165461 | 22.05.2015 | US201414267500 | 01.05.2014 | US201161554676 | 02.11.2011 | US201715438290 | 21.02.2017 | US201562175666 | 15.06.2015 | WO2012US63298 | 02.11.2012 | US201815924819 | 19.03.2018 | US201615160675 | 20.05.2016 | US201261587439 | 17.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6151263B | Global Dossier | 21.06.2017 | B2 | JP2015504627 | 12.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161554676 | 02.11.2011 | WO2012US63298 | 02.11.2012 | US201261587439 | 17.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3364095 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2019 | B1 | EP3364095 | 22.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715438290 | 21.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3298319 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2019 | A4 | EP3298319 | 28.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US33533 | 20.05.2016 | US201562165461 | 22.05.2015 | US201562175666 | 15.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108458224B | Global Dossier | 13.12.2019 | B | CN108458224 | 28.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715438290 | 21.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107614959B | Global Dossier | 15.09.2020 | B | CN107614959 | 19.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US33533 | 20.05.2016 | US201562165461 | 22.05.2015 | US201562175666 | 15.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2773896 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2018 | B1 | EP2773896 | 26.08.2015 | A4 | EP2773896 | 10.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161554676 | 02.11.2011 | WO2012US63298 | 02.11.2012 | US201261587439 | 17.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2765417T | 09.06.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201715438290 | 21.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013067335 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161554676 | 02.11.2011 | US201261587439 | 17.01.2012 |