EP2773973 - POSITIONING OF USER EQUIPMENT BASED ON VIRTUAL REFERENCE MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/19] |
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
For all designated states Zhang, Yang Room 602 No. 9 Lane1662 Zhang Yang Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200135 / CN | |||
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
For all designated states Zhang, Yang Room 602 No. 9 Lane1662 Zhang Yang Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200135 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yang Room 602 No. 9 Lane1662 Zhang Yang Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200135 / CN | 02 /
SIOMINA, Iana Mäster Simons Väg 20 D41 SE-170 66 Solna / SE | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2017/21] |
Former [2014/37] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista RAN 1 Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 12845185.3 | 06.03.2012 | [2017/21] | WO2012SE50246 | Priority number, date | US201161555531P | 04.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161555531 P | [2014/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013066233 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2773973 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2773973 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, // G01S19/25 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
G01S5/0252 (EP,CN,US);
G01S5/0236 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/37] | G01S5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIONIERUNG VON BENUTZERGERÄTEN AUF DER BASIS VON VIRTUELLEN REFERENZMESSUNGEN | [2014/37] | English: | POSITIONING OF USER EQUIPMENT BASED ON VIRTUAL REFERENCE MEASUREMENTS | [2014/37] | French: | POSITIONNEMENT D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR SUR LA BASE DE MESURES DE RÉFÉRENCE VIRTUELLES | [2014/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 16.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2012 | AL | 24.05.2017 | AT | 24.05.2017 | CY | 24.05.2017 | CZ | 24.05.2017 | DK | 24.05.2017 | EE | 24.05.2017 | ES | 24.05.2017 | FI | 24.05.2017 | HR | 24.05.2017 | IT | 24.05.2017 | LT | 24.05.2017 | LV | 24.05.2017 | MC | 24.05.2017 | MK | 24.05.2017 | NL | 24.05.2017 | PL | 24.05.2017 | PT | 24.05.2017 | RO | 24.05.2017 | RS | 24.05.2017 | SE | 24.05.2017 | SI | 24.05.2017 | SK | 24.05.2017 | SM | 24.05.2017 | TR | 24.05.2017 | BG | 24.08.2017 | NO | 24.08.2017 | GR | 25.08.2017 | IS | 24.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 06.03.2012 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
MK | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PT | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 06.03.2012 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PT | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6324473 (ESCHENBACH RALPH [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2002082774 (BLOEBAUM LELAND SCOTT [US]) [X] 1,16 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 11] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0023] , [0 25] , [0 27] - [0034] * [I] 2-7,11,13-15; | [A]US2007055445 (JANKY JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US2010150117 (AWEYA JAMES [CA], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2012099827 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [E] 1,16 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0025] , [0 26] , [0 33] , [0 34] , [0 48] , [0 49] * * paragraphs [0069] , [0 85] - [0090] * | International search | [Y]WO2004023155 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [Y]US2009253436 (NIENTIEDT ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US2010309051 (MOSHFEGHI MEHRAN [US]); | [A] - LEI XIE ET AL., "A New Indoor Localization Method Based on Inversion Propagation Model", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS NETWORKING AND MOBILE COMPUTING (WICOM), 2010 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (20100923), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://ieeexpiore.ieee.org/stamp/stamp.jsp?tp=&arnumber=560 0847&isnumber=5600089, XP031774719 | [A] - WIDYAWAN ET AL., "Influence of Predicted and Measured Fingerprint on the Accuracy of RSSI-based Indoor Location Systems", POSITIONING, NAVIGATION AND COMMUNICATION, 2007. WPNC '07. 4TH WORKSHOP ON, (20070322), pages 145 - 151, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/stamp/stamp.jsp?tp=&arnumber=416 7832&isnumber=4167799, XP031080630 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WPNC.2007.353626 | by applicant | US2002082774 | WO2012099827 |