EP2773843 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONVERTING CLASS II HYDRATE RESERVOIRS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [2015/25] |
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Incorporated 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, California 94583 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALCZEWSKI, John T. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, California 94583 / US | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2014/37] | Application number, filing date | 12846567.1 | 26.09.2012 | WO2012US57196 | Priority number, date | US201113285936 | 31.10.2011 Original published format: US201113285936 | [2014/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013066527 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2773843 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E21B37/06, C08G69/10, C08F226/06 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
E21B33/138 (EP,US);
E21B41/0099 (EP,US);
E21B43/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON KLASSE-II-HYDRAT-RESERVOIRS | [2014/37] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONVERTING CLASS II HYDRATE RESERVOIRS | [2014/37] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION DE RÉSERVOIRS D'HYDRATE DE CLASSE II | [2014/37] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/44] | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2009032248 (SVOBODA MICHAL [CZ], et al); | [Y]US5002127 (DALRYMPLE DWYANN [US], et al); | [Y]US2009065210 (GULLAPALLI IRENE [US], et al); | [Y]US2011088898 (HORTON ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]US6443229 (KULKA DANIEL S [US]) |